This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 08/13/2018 at 23:21:06 (UTC).

Poupette LeDeux-Lopez vs Hector LeDeux

Case Summary

On 03/17/2017 Poupette LeDeux-Lopez filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Hector LeDeux. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Family Law Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Agbayani, Tony J.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************1410

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Family Law Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Agbayani, Tony J.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LeDeux-Lopez, Poupette

Respondent

LeDeux, Hector

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

Abelson, Arthur R

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2017
  • Findings and Orders After Hearing as to Hector LeDeux Granted. Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • Order Quashing filed by Hector LeDeux. Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • Hearing re: Request for Order-Initial held on June 21, 2017. Judge: McCann, Cheryl A..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • Minutes finalized for Request for Order-Initial held on 06/21/2017 08:15 AM . Judge: McCann, Cheryl A..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • Tentative Ruling published. Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • Payment received in the amount of $21.50, receipt number 177921. Judge: Agbayani, Tony J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • Responsive Declaration to Request for Order filed by LeDeux-Lopez, Poupette. Action Type: Responsive Declaration to Request for Order; Judge: McCann, Cheryl A..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • Attorney, Arthur R Abelson, retained for Hector LeDeux . Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • Hearing regarding: Request for Order-Initial Resp's RFO Motion to Quash/ Abate Case due to Pending Alameda County Disso **Tentative Ruling**, set for 06/21/2017 at 8:15 AM before Hon. Cheryl A. McCann in Department F3. Judge: McCann, Cheryl A..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support of respondent's Motion to quash/abate action filed. Action Type: Memorandum; Judge: McCann, Cheryl A..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • Payment received by Hector LeDeux in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 170272. Judge: McCann, Cheryl A..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • RFO-Request for Order (First Paper) filed by LeDeux, Hector. Action Type: RFO-Request for Order (First Paper); Judge: McCann, Cheryl A..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • Amended Petition for Dissolution of Marriage filed by LeDeux-Lopez, Poupette. Action Type: Amended Petition; Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • Order on Application for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs - Granted as to Poupette LeDeux-Lopez. Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • Request to Waive Court Fees filed by LeDeux-Lopez, Poupette. Action Type: Request to Waive Court Fees; Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • Income and Expense Declaration filed by LeDeux-Lopez, Poupette. Action Type: Income and Expense Declaration; Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • Community and Quasi Community Property Declaration filed by LeDeux-Lopez, Poupette. Action Type: Community and Quasi Community Property Declaration; Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • Summons issued and filed. Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • Petition for Dissolution of Marriage filed by LeDeux-Lopez, Poupette. Action Type: Petition for Dissolution of Marriage; Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • Case initiated. Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less