This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 12/09/2021 at 21:03:40 (UTC).

Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC vs. Jackie R George

Case Summary

On 11/10/2010 Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Jackie R George. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Tracy Branch Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************8893

  • Filing Date:

    11/10/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC

Defendant

George, Jackie R

 

Court Documents

PLD-C-001 Complaint

11/10/2010: PLD-C-001 Complaint

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/10/2010: CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

SUM100 Summons - Civil

11/10/2010: SUM100 Summons - Civil

Payment Receipt

11/16/2010: Payment Receipt

Notice of Case Assignment Scheduling Information and Notice of Hearing

11/16/2010: Notice of Case Assignment Scheduling Information and Notice of Hearing

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

12/06/2010: POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

CM200 Notice of Settlement of Entire Case

03/18/2011: CM200 Notice of Settlement of Entire Case

Conditional Settlement Agreement

05/18/2011: Conditional Settlement Agreement

Payment Receipt

05/19/2011: Payment Receipt

Payment Receipt

05/19/2011: Payment Receipt

Order on Settlement Agreement and Stipulation for judgment

05/19/2011: Order on Settlement Agreement and Stipulation for judgment

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

07/18/2011: CIV110 Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2019
  • DocketCase status updated to Closed. Judge: CONVERSION,.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2011
  • DocketMilestone of Disposition 24 months met timely. Judge: CONVERSION,.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2011
  • DocketMilestone of Disposition 18 months met timely. Judge: CONVERSION,.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2011
  • DocketComplaint associated on 07/21/2011. Judge: CONVERSION,.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2011
  • DocketUpdate zipcode to 95336 effective 07/21/2011. Judge: CONVERSION,.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2011
  • DocketCase disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. Judge: CONVERSION,.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2011
  • DocketComplaint disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. Judge: CONVERSION,.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2011
  • DocketStatus of Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC updated to Dismissed without Prejudice. Judge: CONVERSION,.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2011
  • DocketStatus of Jackie George updated to Dismissed without Prejudice. Judge: CONVERSION,.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2011
  • DocketAutomatic Rule 3.740 Collections Failure to File Default Clock stopped. Judge: CONVERSION,.

    Read MoreRead Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 11/16/2010
  • DocketVolume 1 created and added to case file with an ROA Start Date of 11/10/2010. Judge: CONVERSION,.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2010
  • DocketPayment received for 170 - Complaint or other 1st paper <=$10K in the amount of 225.00 on 11/16/2010, transaction number 646770 and receipt number 162811. Judge: CONVERSION,.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2010
  • DocketAddress for Janalie Henriques selected. Judge: CONVERSION,.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2010
  • DocketAutomatic Limited Case Disposition Clock started. Judge: CONVERSION,.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2010
  • DocketSummons issued. Judge: CONVERSION,.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2010
  • DocketCase assigned to Department T1. Judge: CONVERSION,.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2010
  • DocketStatement of Venue filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC on 11/10/2010. Judge: CONVERSION,.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2010
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC on 11/10/2010. Judge: CONVERSION,.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2010
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC on 11/10/2010. Judge: CONVERSION,.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2010
  • DocketComplaint filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC on 11/10/2010. Judge: CONVERSION,.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC is a litigant