This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 07:49:34 (UTC).

PMGI Financial, LLC, vs Doloris Moody

Case Summary

On 02/24/2016 PMGI Financial, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Doloris Moody. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts , Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ross, Roger. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************1939

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Ross, Roger

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PMGI Financial, LLC,

PMGI Financial, LLC, A Limited Liability Company

Defendants

Moody, Doloris

Doloris Moody aka Dolores Stokes,

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kenosian, John P

 

Court Documents

JUD100 Judgment

Judgment for PMGI Financial, LLC, against Doloris Moody in the amount of $6988.61 Judge: Ross, Roger.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Default against Doloris Moody Entered Judge: Ross, Roger.

Declaration

Declaration in Support of Judgment filed by PMGI Financial, LLC,. Action Type: Declaration in Support; Judge: Ross, Roger.

Complaint

Complaint Limited (amount up to $10,000) filed by PMGI Financial, LLC,. Action Type: Complaint Limited (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Ross, Roger.

Declaration

Declaration in Support of Assignment of Account filed by PMGI Financial, LLC,. Action Type: Declaration in Support; Judge: Ross, Roger.

Notice of Entry of Judgment

Notice of Entry of Judgment filed by PMGI Financial, LLC,. Action Type: Notice of Entry of Judgment; Judge: Ross, Roger.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Ross, Roger.

Declaration

Original Creditor's Declaration in Support of Entry of Default Judgment filed by PMGI Financial, LLC,. Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Ross, Roger.

MC012 Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment $167.00, Acknowledgment of Credit $1417.89, and Declaration of Accrued Interest $565.97 filed by PMGI Financial, LLC, A Limited Liability Company. Action Type: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment.; Judge: Ross, Roger.

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal Does filed by PMGI Financial, LLC,. Action Type: Request for Dismissal Does; Judge: Ross, Roger.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Doloris Moody served on 03/12/2016. Type of Service Personal. $60.00. Judge: Ross, Roger.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by PMGI Financial, LLC,. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Ross, Roger.

NoticeofCaseAssignment-WithoutHearing.rtf

Notice of Case Assignment. Judge: Ross, Roger.

Declaration

Declaration in Re: CCP. 1033 filed by PMGI Financial, LLC,. Action Type: Declaration Pursuant to CCP 1033; Judge: Ross, Roger.

EJ130 Writ of Execution

08/02/2017: EJ130 Writ of Execution

MC012 Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment $25.00, Acknowledgment of Credit $0.00, and Declaration of Accrued Interest $111.05 filed by PMGI Financial, LLC, A Limited Liability Company. Action Type: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment.; Judge: Ross, Roger.

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2017
  • Writ of Execution issued as to Doloris Moody aka Dolores Stokes on 12/20/2017 to San Joaquin County. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • Payment received by LLC, PMGI Financial in the amount of $25.00. Receipt number 243906. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment $167.00, Acknowledgment of Credit $1417.89, and Declaration of Accrued Interest $565.97 filed by PMGI Financial, LLC, A Limited Liability Company. Action Type: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment.; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • Abstract of Judgment Issued. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • Payment received by LLC, PMGI Financial in the amount of $25.00. Receipt number 158274. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • Payment received by LLC, PMGI Financial in the amount of $25.00. Receipt number 135653. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment $25.00, Acknowledgment of Credit $0.00, and Declaration of Accrued Interest $111.05 filed by PMGI Financial, LLC, A Limited Liability Company. Action Type: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment.; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment filed by PMGI Financial, LLC,. Action Type: Notice of Entry of Judgment; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2016
  • Case status updated to Disposed. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment for PMGI Financial, LLC, against Doloris Moody in the amount of $6988.61 Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 06/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Creditor's Declaration in Support of Entry of Default Judgment filed by PMGI Financial, LLC,. Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2016
  • Request for Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed by PMGI Financial, LLC,. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to Doloris Moody served on 03/12/2016. Type of Service Personal. $60.00. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Limited (amount up to $10,000) filed by PMGI Financial, LLC,. Action Type: Complaint Limited (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by PMGI Financial, LLC,. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Payment received by in the amount of $225.00. Receipt number 34866. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Attorney, John P Kenosian, retained for PMGI Financial, LLC, . Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Case Assignment. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less