This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 01/17/2023 at 04:08:10 (UTC).

PJ's Lumber, Inc. dba PJ's Rebar, Inc., a California corporation et al. vs United Rebar, Inc., a California corporation et al.

Case Summary

On 08/10/2022 PJ's Lumber, Inc dba PJ's Rebar, Inc , a California corporation filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against United Rebar, Inc , a California corporation. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Waters, Robert T.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************6975

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Waters, Robert T.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

PJ's Lumber, Inc. dba PJ's Rebar, Inc., a California corporation

United Rebar, Inc., a California corporation

Defendants and Cross Defendants

Alston Construction Company, Inc. a California corporation

LIT Industrial Limited Partnership, a Delaware limited partnership

The Western Surety Compnay, a South Dakota corporation

United Rebar, Inc., a California corporation

Cross Plaintiff

Western Surety Company, A South Dakota Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bertossa, Brian D.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

Sosa, Carlos Eduardo

Cross Defendant Attorney

McCutcheon Jr., Stephen R.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed.

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by PJ's Lumber, Inc. dba PJ's Rebar, Inc., a California corporation.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by PJ's Lumber, Inc. dba PJ's Rebar, Inc., a California corporation.

Cross-Complaint

Verified Cross-Complaint of Western Surety Company for Interpleader filed by Western Surety Company, A South Dakota Corporation.

General Denial

General Denial of Western Surety Company to Complaint filed by The Western Surety Company, a South Dakota corporation.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons on Cross-Complaint issued and filed.

Answer

PJ's Rebar, Inc.'s Verified Answer to Cross-Complaint of Western Surety Company filed by PJ's Lumber, Inc. dba PJ's Rebar, Inc., a California corporation.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Default against LIT Industrial Limited Partnership, a Delaware limited partnership Not Entered

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to LIT Industrial Limited Partnership, a Delaware limited partnership served on 08/16/2022 by Personal Service. $66.49.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to The Western Surety Compnay, a South Dakota corporation served on 08/16/2022 by Personal Service. $112.54.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Alston Construction Company, Inc. a California corporation served on 08/16/2022 by Personal Service. $37.33.

Affidavit

Affidavit of Reasonable Diligence filed by Western Surety Company, A South Dakota Corporation.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Default against LIT Industrial Limited Partnership, a Delaware limited partnership Entered

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Western Surety Company, A South Dakota Corporation.

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Court Room: 11B; Judge: Robert T. Waters; Participants; Alston Construction Company, Inc. a California corporation (Defendant); LIT Industrial Limited Partnership, a Delaware limited partnership (Defendant); PJ's Lumber, Inc. dba PJ's Rebar, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff); The Western Surety Compnay, a South Dakota corporation (Defendant); United Rebar, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Western Surety Company, A South Dakota Corporation.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Default against LIT Industrial Limited Partnership, a Delaware limited partnership Entered; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default - Civil filed by PJ's Lumber, Inc. dba PJ's Rebar, Inc., a California corporation.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Reasonable Diligence filed by Western Surety Company, A South Dakota Corporation.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Alston Construction Company, Inc. a California corporation served on 08/16/2022 by Personal Service. $37.33.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to The Western Surety Compnay, a South Dakota corporation served on 08/16/2022 by Personal Service. $112.54.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to LIT Industrial Limited Partnership, a Delaware limited partnership served on 08/16/2022 by Personal Service. $66.49.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Default against LIT Industrial Limited Partnership, a Delaware limited partnership Not Entered; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default - Civil as to Lit Industrial filed by PJ's Lumber, Inc. dba PJ's Rebar, Inc., a California corporation.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketPayment received by a The Western Surety Compnay in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 771909.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketAttorney, Carlos Eduardo Sosa, retained for The Western Surety Compnay, a South Dakota corporation .; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 02/06/2023 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Robert T. Waters in Department 11B.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by PJ's Lumber, Inc. dba PJ's Rebar, Inc., a California corporation.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by PJ's Lumber, Inc. dba PJ's Rebar, Inc., a California corporation.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketPayment received by Inc. PJ's Lumber in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 762083.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketAttorney, Brian D. Bertossa, retained for PJ's Lumber, Inc. dba PJ's Rebar, Inc., a California corporation .; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketCase initiated.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LIT INDUSTRIAL LIMITED PARTNERSHIP (A DELAWARE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP) is a litigant

Latest cases where P.J.'S LUMBER, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Alston Construction Company, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Western Surety Company is a litigant