This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 07:47:55 (UTC).

Phillips Farms, Llc vs KLH Consulting Incorporated

Case Summary

On 02/24/2016 Phillips Farms, Llc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against KLH Consulting Incorporated. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts , Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ross, Roger. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************1919

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Ross, Roger

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Phillips Farms, Llc

Defendant

KLH Consulting Incorporated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Diehl, Trenton M

Defendant Attorney

Beam, Karin Patricia

 

Court Documents

Notice of Hearing

06/28/2016: Notice of Hearing

Notice

Notice of Change of Firm Name filed by Phillips Farms, Llc. Action Type: Notice - (Other); Judge: Ross, Roger.

Declaration in Support

Declaration of Hub Lampert in Support of Motion for Change of Venue filed by KLH Consulting Incorporated. Action Type: Declaration in Support; Judge: Ross, Roger.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to KLH Consulting Incorporated served on 03/04/2016. Type of Service Personal. $0.00. Judge: Ross, Roger.

CM200 Notice of Settlement of Entire Case

Notice of Settlement - Unconditional filed by Phillips Farms, Llc. Action Type: Notice of Settlement - Unconditional; Judge: Ross, Roger.

Notice of Motion

Notice of Motion and Motion for Change of Venue; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by KLH Consulting Incorporated. Action Type: First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000); Judge: Ross, Roger.

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal - Entire Action as to Phillips Farms, LLC, KLH Consulting Incorporated Entered. Judge: Ross, Roger.

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Phillips Farms, Llc. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Ross, Roger.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for CMC: Request for Dismissal held on 08/03/2016 08:30 AM . Judge: Ross, Roger.

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Ross, Roger.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Phillips Farms, Llc. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Ross, Roger.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Ross, Roger.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2016
  • Hearing regarding: CMC: Request for Dismissal , set for 09/07/2016 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Roger Ross in Department 13. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2016
  • Hearing re: CMC: Request for Dismissal held on August 3, 2016. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for CMC: Request for Dismissal held on 08/03/2016 08:30 AM . Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2016
  • Hearing Result: CMC Vacated Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2016
  • Case status updated to Disposed. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal - Entire Action as to Phillips Farms, LLC, KLH Consulting Incorporated Entered. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2016
  • Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Phillips Farms, LLC. Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2016
  • Hearing regarding: CMC: Request for Dismissal , set for 08/03/2016 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Roger Ross in Department 13. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2016
  • Hearing Result: Vacated Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Settlement - Unconditional filed by Phillips Farms, Llc. Action Type: Notice of Settlement - Unconditional; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 05/31/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Change of Firm Name filed by Phillips Farms, Llc. Action Type: Notice - (Other); Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to KLH Consulting Incorporated served on 03/04/2016. Type of Service Personal. $0.00. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2016
  • Hearing regarding: CMC: Further Case Management Conference , set for 08/25/2016 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Roger Ross in Department 13. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Phillips Farms, Llc. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Payment received by in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 34673. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Attorney, Trenton M Diehl, retained for Phillips Farms, Llc . Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Phillips Farms, Llc. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less