This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 03/15/2020 at 06:30:49 (UTC).

Petition of Vanessa Chame Ramirez

Case Summary

On 09/18/2019 Petition of Vanessa Chame Ramirez was filed as an Other - Name Change lawsuit. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts , Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Guy Castillo, Erin. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************2298

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Name Change

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Guy Castillo, Erin

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Ramirez, Vanessa Chame

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketCase status updated to Disposed. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketHearing re: OSC- Change of Name held on November 8, 2019. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketMinutes finalized for OSC- Change of Name held on 11/08/2019 11:00 AM . Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketPetition for Change of Name filed by Vanessa Chame Ramirez is Granted Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • DocketProof of Publication filed by Ramirez, Vanessa Chame. Action Type: Proof of Publication; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Change of Name filed by Vanessa Chame Ramirez. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketOrder on Application for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs - Granted as to Vanessa Chame Ramirez. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketHearing regarding: OSC- Change of Name , set for 11/08/2019 at 11:00 AM before Hon. Erin Guy Castillo in Department 3A. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees filed by Ramirez, Vanessa Chame. Action Type: Request to Waive Court Fees; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketPetition for Change of Name filed by Ramirez, Vanessa Chame. Action Type: Petition for Change of Name; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Ramirez, Vanessa Chame. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.