This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 01/13/2023 at 08:33:08 (UTC).

Petition of Tahama Village Mobile Home Park

Case Summary

On 03/03/2022 Petition of Tahama Village Mobile Home Park was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Waters, Robert T.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************1948

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Waters, Robert T.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Tahama Village Mobile Home Park

Respondents

Freedom 123, LLC

McClendon, Diana J

Prince, Frederick

State of California Department of Housing and Community Development

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Rowe, Anthony Drew

 

Court Documents

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Tahama Village Mobile Home Park.

Notice of hearing

Notice of Hearing on Petition filed by Tahama Village Mobile Home Park.

Petition

Petition for Judicial Declaration of Abandonment filed by Tahama Village Mobile Home Park.

Minute_Order.rtf

Minutes finalized for Miscellaneous Hearing held on 04/25/2022 09:30 AM .

Judgment

Judgment by Court entered and filed.

Declaration

Inventory of Personal Property for Abandonment Sale filed by Tahama Village Mobile Home Park.

Notice

Notice of Sale of Property at Abandonment Sale filed by Tahama Village Mobile Home Park.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInventory of Personal Property for Abandonment Sale filed by Tahama Village Mobile Home Park.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Sale of Property at Abandonment Sale filed by Tahama Village Mobile Home Park.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • HearingHearing Type: CMC: Further Case Management Conference; Court Room: 11B; Result: Vacated; Judge: Robert T. Waters; Participants; Diana J McClendon (Respondent); Frederick Prince (Respondent); Freedom 123, LLC (Respondent); State of California Department of Housing and Community Development (Respondent); Tahama Village Mobile Home Park (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • DocketHearing Result: Vacated; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • HearingHearing Type: Miscellaneous Hearing; Court Room: 11B; Result: Held; Judge: Robert T. Waters; Participants; Diana J McClendon (Respondent); Frederick Prince (Respondent); Freedom 123, LLC (Respondent); State of California Department of Housing and Community Development (Respondent); Tahama Village Mobile Home Park (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment by Court entered and filed.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Miscellaneous Hearing held on 04/25/2022 09:30 AM .; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketHearing re: Miscellaneous Hearing held on April 25, 2022.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketCase status updated to Disposed.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketHearing regarding: Miscellaneous Hearing Petition for Abandonment of mobile home (Special Set) per court room---th, set for 04/25/2022 at 9:30 AM before Hon. Robert T. Waters in Department 11B.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketHearing regarding: CMC: Further Case Management Conference , set for 06/14/2022 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Robert T. Waters in Department 11B.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Tahama Village Mobile Home Park.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing on Petition filed by Tahama Village Mobile Home Park.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Judicial Declaration of Abandonment filed by Tahama Village Mobile Home Park.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketPayment received by Tahama Village Mobile Home Park in the amount of $225.00. Receipt number 723938.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketAttorney, Anthony Drew Rowe, retained for Tahama Village Mobile Home Park .; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketCase initiated.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less