This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 07:37:30 (UTC).

Petition of Rachel M. Rodriguez

Case Summary

On 02/23/2016 Petition of Rachel M Rodriguez was filed as an Other - Name Change lawsuit. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts , Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Sparks, Sheryle. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************1805

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Name Change

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Sparks, Sheryle

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Rodriguez, Rachel M.

Minors

Newhauser, Sonny Ray

Newhauser, Leo Gage

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition for Change of Name filed by Rachel M. Rodriguez, Leo Gage Newhauser, Sonny Ray Newhauser is Granted Judge: Soldati, John.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for OSC- Change of Name held on 07/01/2016 11:13 AM . Judge: Soldati, John.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2016
  • Hearing re: OSC- Change of Name held on July 1, 2016. Judge: Soldati, John.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service by Certified Mail Action Type: Proof of Service by Certified Mail; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2016
  • Hearing regarding: OSC- Change of Name , set for 07/01/2016 at 11:00 AM before Hon. Sheryle Sparks in Department 17. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for OSC- Change of Name held on 05/20/2016 11:00 AM . Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2016
  • OSC- Change of Name scheduled on 05/20/2016 at 11:00 AM has been Continued. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Publication filed by Rodriguez, Rachel M.. Action Type: Proof of Publication; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2016
  • Hearing regarding: OSC- Change of Name , set for 05/20/2016 at 11:00 AM before Hon. Sheryle Sparks in Department 17. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2016
  • Hearing Result: Continued - Parties Motion Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Order to Show Cause filed by Rodriguez, Rachel M.. Action Type: Order to Show Cause; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Hearing regarding: OSC- Change of Name , set for 04/15/2016 at 11:00 AM before Hon. Sheryle Sparks in Department 17. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Order to Show Cause filed by Rodriguez, Rachel M.. Action Type: Order to Show Cause; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Order on Application for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs - Granted as to Rachel M. Rodriguez filed. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition for Change of Name filed by Rodriguez, Rachel M.. Action Type: Petition for Change of Name; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Rodriguez, Rachel M.. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Request to Waive Court Fees filed by Rodriguez, Rachel M.. Action Type: Request to Waive Court Fees; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less