This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 07:41:24 (UTC).

Petition of Orchard Estates Mobile Home Park

Case Summary

On 02/23/2016 Petition of Orchard Estates Mobile Home Park was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts , Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lofthus, Linda L.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************1847

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Lofthus, Linda L.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Orchard Estates Mobile Home Park

Respondents

Gaylord, Doug

Crane, Jacqueline

State of California Department of Housing and Community Development

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Rowe, Anthony Drew

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service

Proof of service of Petition for Declaration of Judicial Abandonment, Notice of hearing Date filed by Orchard Estates Mobile Home Park. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Orchard Estates Mobile Home Park. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

Notice of Case Assignment - Without Hearing

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

Limited Civil Petition

Limited Civil Petition - (amount up to $10,000) filed by Orchard Estates Mobile Home Park. Action Type: Limited Civil Petition - (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

Notice of Case Assignment - Without Hearing

02/23/2016: Notice of Case Assignment - Without Hearing

Judgment for judicial abandonment for PLTF Orchard Estates Mobile Home Park against DEFTS Doug Gaylord and Jacqueline Crane for the total sum of $3,450.00

Judgment for judicial abandonment for PLTF Orchard Estates Mobile Home Park against DEFTS Doug Gaylord and Jacqueline Crane for the total sum of $3,450.00 signed by Judge Lofthus entered and filed. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

TentativeRuling/ProbateNote.rtf

03/25/2016: TentativeRuling/ProbateNote.rtf

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Miscellaneous Hearing held on 03/30/2016 09:00 AM . Judge: Sueyres, F. Clark.

TentativeRuling/ProbateNote.rtf

Tentative Ruling published. Judge: Sueyres, F. Clark.

Notice

Notice of Hearing on Petition filed by Orchard Estates Mobile Home Park. Action Type: Notice of Hearing on Petition; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/18/2016
  • Case status updated to Disposed. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment for judicial abandonment for PLTF Orchard Estates Mobile Home Park against DEFTS Doug Gaylord and Jacqueline Crane for the total sum of $3,450.00 signed by Judge Lofthus entered and filed. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2016
  • Case status updated to Judgment Pending. Judge: Sueyres, F. Clark.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2016
  • Judgment by Court entered and recorded. Judge: Sueyres, F. Clark.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2016
  • Hearing re: Miscellaneous Hearing held on March 30, 2016. Judge: Sueyres, F. Clark.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Miscellaneous Hearing held on 03/30/2016 09:00 AM . Judge: Sueyres, F. Clark.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Tentative Ruling published. Judge: Sueyres, F. Clark.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of service of Petition for Declaration of Judicial Abandonment, Notice of hearing Date filed by Orchard Estates Mobile Home Park. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Hearing regarding: Miscellaneous Hearing , set for 03/30/2016 at 9:00 AM before Hon. Linda L. Lofthus in Department 11. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Payment received by in the amount of $225.00. Receipt number 34049. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing on Petition filed by Orchard Estates Mobile Home Park. Action Type: Notice of Hearing on Petition; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Limited Civil Petition - (amount up to $10,000) filed by Orchard Estates Mobile Home Park. Action Type: Limited Civil Petition - (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Orchard Estates Mobile Home Park. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Attorney, Anthony Drew Rowe, retained for Orchard Estates Mobile Home Park . Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less