This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 07:46:44 (UTC).

Petition of Nasratullah Naibkhil

Case Summary

On 02/24/2016 Petition of Nasratullah Naibkhil was filed as an Other - Name Change lawsuit. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts , Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Sparks, Sheryle. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************1904

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Name Change

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Sparks, Sheryle

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Kakar, Freshta

Naibkhil, Nasratullah

Minor

Mateen, Naibkhill

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Amended Decree Changing Name is Entered Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2016
  • Case status updated to Disposed. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition for Change of Name filed by Naibkhill Mateen, Nasratullah Naibkhil, Freshta Kakar is Granted Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for OSC- Change of Name held on 04/15/2016 03:14 PM . Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2016
  • Hearing re: OSC- Change of Name held on April 15, 2016. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Publication filed by Naibkhil, Nasratullah; Kakar, Freshta. Action Type: Proof of Publication; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Publication filed by Naibkhil, Nasratullah; Kakar, Freshta. Action Type: Proof of Publication; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Hearing regarding: OSC- Change of Name , set for 04/15/2016 at 11:00 AM before Hon. Sheryle Sparks in Department 17. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Order to Show Cause filed by Naibkhil, Nasratullah; Kakar, Freshta. Action Type: Order to Show Cause; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Payment received by in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 34573. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Naibkhil, Nasratullah; Kakar, Freshta. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition for Change of Name filed by Naibkhil, Nasratullah; Kakar, Freshta. Action Type: Petition for Change of Name; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less