This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 07:38:14 (UTC).

Peter F. Martin vs Olivia Reilley

Case Summary

On 02/23/2016 Peter F Martin filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Olivia Reilley. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts , Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Sparks, Sheryle. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************1814

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Sparks, Sheryle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Martin, Peter F.

Defendant

Reilley, Olivia

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

McDaniel, Daniel Allen

 

Court Documents

Clerk's Certificate of Mailing Attachment Page

Order for Temporary Stay as to Olivia Reilley Denied and filed. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Order on ExParte Application for Temporary Stay of Execution of Unlawful Detainer Judgment

03/15/2016: Order on ExParte Application for Temporary Stay of Execution of Unlawful Detainer Judgment

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Default against Olivia Reilley Entered Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Declaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585

Declaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585 filed by Martin, Peter F.. Action Type: Declaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Olivia Reilley served on 02/24/2016. Type of Service Personal. . Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

UD110 Judgment- Unlawful Detainer

Clerk's Default Judgment for Possession for Peter F. Martin against Olivia Reilley filed and entered Judgment does not apply to all occupants. See judgment filed herein. . Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

UD110 Judgment- Unlawful Detainer

Judgment for Peter F. Martin against Olivia Reilley in the amount of $1623.28. See judgment filed herein. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Declaration for Issuance of Writ of Possession pursuant to CCP 712.010

Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010 filed by Martin, Peter F.. Action Type: Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

NoticethatYouHaveBeenSued.rtf

Notice That You Have Been Sued. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Ex Parte Application for Temporary Stay of Execution of Unlawful Detainer Judgment

Ex Parte Application and Declaration for Temporary Stay of Eviction filed by Reilley, Olivia. Action Type: Ex Parte Application for Temporary Stay of Eviction; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Writ Return

Writ of Possession as to Olivia Reilley served on 03/09/2016 by Returned With Full Satisfaction. $145.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Martin, Peter F.. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

SUM130 Summons - Unlawful Detainer

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Unlawful Detainer; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

FW003 Order on Court Fee Waiver

Order on Application for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs - Granted as to Olivia Reilley filed. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Complaint

Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000) filed by Martin, Peter F.. Action Type: Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Court Judgment filed by Martin, Peter F.. Action Type: Request for Entry of Court Judgment; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment for Peter F. Martin against Olivia Reilley in the amount of $1623.28. See judgment filed herein. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Entry of Court Judgment filed by Martin, Peter F.. Action Type: Request for Entry of Court Judgment; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585 filed by Martin, Peter F.. Action Type: Declaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Possession as to Olivia Reilley served on 03/09/2016 by Returned With Full Satisfaction. $145.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Order for Temporary Stay as to Olivia Reilley Denied and filed. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Order on Application for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs - Granted as to Olivia Reilley filed. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Ex Parte Application and Declaration for Temporary Stay of Eviction filed by Reilley, Olivia. Action Type: Ex Parte Application for Temporary Stay of Eviction; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2016
  • Request to Waive Court Fees filed by Reilley, Olivia. Action Type: Request to Waive Court Fees; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2016
  • Case status updated to Disposed. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2016
  • Writ of Possession issued as to Olivia Reilley on 03/02/2016 to . Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 03/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Default against Olivia Reilley Entered Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to Olivia Reilley served on 02/24/2016. Type of Service Personal. . Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment filed by Martin, Peter F.. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Martin, Peter F.. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Unlawful Detainer; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000) filed by Martin, Peter F.. Action Type: Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Payment received by in the amount of $240.00. Receipt number 33776. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Attorney, Daniel Allen McDaniel, retained for Peter F. Martin . Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice That You Have Been Sued. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less