This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 07:38:35 (UTC).

Peter F. Martin vs Luz Valencia

Case Summary

On 02/23/2016 Peter F Martin filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Luz Valencia. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts , Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Sparks, Sheryle. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************1817

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Sparks, Sheryle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Martin, Peter F.

Defendant

Valencia, Luz

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

McDaniel, Daniel Allen

 

Court Documents

Declaration in Support of ExParte Application for Temporary Stay of Execution of Unlawful Detainer Judgment

Declaration in support of Temp Stay of Execution of Judgment filed by Valencia, Luz. Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Ex Parte Application for Temporary Stay of Execution of Unlawful Detainer Judgment

Ex Parte Application for Temporary Stay of Eviction filed by Valencia, Luz. Action Type: Ex Parte Application for Temporary Stay of Eviction; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Complaint

Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000) filed by Martin, Peter F.. Action Type: Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Default against Luz Valencia Entered Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Court Judgment filed by Martin, Peter F..-CORRECTED COPY Action Type: Request for Entry of Court Judgment; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

UD110 Judgment- Unlawful Detainer

Clerk's Default Judgment for Possession for Peter F. Martin against Luz Valencia filed and entered Judgment does not apply to all occupants. See judgment filed herein. . Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

NoticethatYouHaveBeenSued.rtf

Notice That You Have Been Sued. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Luz Valencia served on 02/27/2016. Type of Service Personal. $40.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Declaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585

Declaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585 filed by Martin, Peter F.. Action Type: Declaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Clerk's Certificate of Mailing Attachment Page

03/15/2016: Clerk's Certificate of Mailing Attachment Page

Order on ExParte Application for Temporary Stay of Execution of Unlawful Detainer Judgment

Order for Temporary Stay as to Luz Valencia Denied and filed. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Court Judgment filed by Martin, Peter F..-ERROR on Form Action Type: Request for Entry of Court Judgment; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Martin, Peter F.. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

FW003 Order on Court Fee Waiver

Order on Application for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs - Granted as to Luz Valencia filed. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

SUM130 Summons - Unlawful Detainer

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Unlawful Detainer; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Declaration for Issuance of Writ of Possession pursuant to CCP 712.010

Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010 filed by Martin, Peter F.. Action Type: Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

UD110 Judgment- Unlawful Detainer

Judgment for Peter F. Martin against Luz Valencia in the amount of $1623.28. See judgment filed herein. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Writ Return

Writ of Possession as to Luz Valencia served on 03/09/2016 by Returned With Full Satisfaction. $145.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment for Peter F. Martin against Luz Valencia in the amount of $1623.28. See judgment filed herein. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Entry of Court Judgment filed by Martin, Peter F..-CORRECTED COPY Action Type: Request for Entry of Court Judgment; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Entry of Court Judgment filed by Martin, Peter F..-ERROR on Form Action Type: Request for Entry of Court Judgment; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585 filed by Martin, Peter F.. Action Type: Declaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Possession as to Luz Valencia served on 03/09/2016 by Returned With Full Satisfaction. $145.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Order for Temporary Stay as to Luz Valencia Denied and filed. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration in support of Temp Stay of Execution of Judgment filed by Valencia, Luz. Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Ex Parte Application for Temporary Stay of Eviction filed by Valencia, Luz. Action Type: Ex Parte Application for Temporary Stay of Eviction; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Order on Application for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs - Granted as to Luz Valencia filed. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2016
  • Request to Waive Court Fees filed by Valencia, Luz. Action Type: Request to Waive Court Fees; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 03/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to Luz Valencia served on 02/27/2016. Type of Service Personal. $40.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2016
  • Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment filed by Martin, Peter F.. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010 filed by Martin, Peter F.. Action Type: Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Payment received by in the amount of $240.00. Receipt number 33791. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Martin, Peter F.. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000) filed by Martin, Peter F.. Action Type: Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Unlawful Detainer; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Attorney, Daniel Allen McDaniel, retained for Peter F. Martin . Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice That You Have Been Sued. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less