This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 03/10/2023 at 05:15:42 (UTC).

Pedro Escalante vs Costco Wholesale Corporation

Case Summary

On 08/22/2022 Pedro Escalante filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Costco Wholesale Corporation. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Abdallah, George J.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************7367

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Abdallah, George J.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Escalante, Pedro

Defendant

Costco Wholesale Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

De La Pena, Gregory R

Defendant Attorney

Collier, Sharon C

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Escalante, Pedro.

cm-010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Escalante, Pedro.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed.

Answer

Defendant's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation.

Minute_Order.rtf

Minutes finalized for Ex Parte held on 02/06/2023 01:30 PM .

Clerk's Certificate of Service by Mail

Minutes finalized for Ex Parte held on 02/06/2023 01:30 PM .

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Escalante, Pedro.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10A; Judge: George J. Abdallah; Participants; Costco Wholesale Corporation (Defendant); Pedro Escalante (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10A; Result: Continued-Court's Motion; Judge: George J. Abdallah; Participants; Costco Wholesale Corporation (Defendant); Pedro Escalante (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • DocketPayment received by Pedro Escalante in the amount of $150.00. Receipt number 810698.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Escalante, Pedro.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • DocketPayment received by Costco Wholesale Corporation in the amount of $150.00. Receipt number 809978.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled on 02/28/2023 at 8:45 AM has been Continued.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 05/23/2023 at 8:45 AM before Hon. George J. Abdallah in Department 10A.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Ex Parte held on 02/06/2023 01:30 PM .; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketAttorney, Sharon C Collier, retained for Costco Wholesale Corporation .; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDefendant's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketPayment received by Costco Wholesale Corporation in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 789498.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 02/28/2023 at 8:45 AM before Hon. George J. Abdallah in Department 10A.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Escalante, Pedro.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Escalante, Pedro.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketPayment received by Pedro Escalante in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 765101.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketAttorney, Gregory R De La Pena, retained for Pedro Escalante .; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketCase initiated.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less