This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 09:56:49 (UTC).

Pauline Rodriguez vs Atwork Personnel Services et al.

Case Summary

On 04/07/2016 Pauline Rodriguez filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against Atwork Personnel Services. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kronlund, Barbara. The case status is Other - Transferred.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************3335

  • Filing Date:

    04/07/2016

  • Case Status:

    Other - Transferred

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kronlund, Barbara

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rodriguez, Pauline

Defendants

Atwork Personnel Services

W.G. Hall LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Corren, Adam Blair

Defendant Attorney

Jones, James T.

 

Court Documents

Notice to State Court and Adverse Party of Filing of Notice of Removal of Civil Action

Defendants Atwork Personnel Services' and W.G. Hall LLC's Notice to State Court and Adverse Party of Filing of Notice of Removal of Civil Action filed by W.G. Hall LLC; Atwork Personnel Services. Action Type: Notice - (Other); Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Answer

First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000) filed by Atwork Personnel Services; W.G. Hall LLC. Action Type: First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000); Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to W.G. Hall LLC served on 04/13/2016. Type of Service Personal. $40.00. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Atwork Personnel Services served on 04/13/2016. Type of Service Personal. $40.00. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

FW003 Order on Court Fee Waiver

Order on Application for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs - Granted as to Pauline Rodriguez filed. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Rodriguez, Pauline. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Rodriguez, Pauline. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2016
  • Hearing Result: Vacated Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2016
  • Case status updated to Removed to Federal Court. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Defendants Atwork Personnel Services' and W.G. Hall LLC's Notice to State Court and Adverse Party of Filing of Notice of Removal of Civil Action filed by W.G. Hall LLC; Atwork Personnel Services. Action Type: Notice - (Other); Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000) filed by Atwork Personnel Services; W.G. Hall LLC. Action Type: First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000); Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2016
  • Payment received by Atwork Personnel Services in the amount of $870.00. Receipt number 59285. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2016
  • Attorney, James T. Jones, retained for W.G. Hall LLC . Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2016
  • Attorney, James T. Jones, retained for Atwork Personnel Services . Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to W.G. Hall LLC served on 04/13/2016. Type of Service Personal. $40.00. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to Atwork Personnel Services served on 04/13/2016. Type of Service Personal. $40.00. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Order on Application for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs - Granted as to Pauline Rodriguez filed. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2016
  • Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 10/04/2016 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 42. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Rodriguez, Pauline. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2016
  • Request to Waive Court Fees filed by Rodriguez, Pauline. Action Type: Request to Waive Court Fees; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Rodriguez, Pauline. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2016
  • Attorney, Adam Blair Corren, retained for Pauline Rodriguez . Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less