This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/11/2021 at 21:29:23 (UTC).

Paul Singh, indiv and as successor-in-interest et al. vs City of Stockton et al.

Case Summary

On 04/15/2016 Paul Singh, indiv and as successor-in-interest filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against City of Stockton. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Lofthus, Linda L. and Scott, W. Stephen. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************3660

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judges

Lofthus, Linda L.

Scott, W. Stephen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Singh Jr., Paul

Defendants

Officer Erika Gonzalez

Officer Kristen McClure

Officer Lance Saur

Officer Pancho Freer

Officer Mike Rodriguez

City of Stockton, on it's own behalf and on behalf of its departments, including, but not limited to, the Stockton Police Department

Officer Gabriel Guerrero

Officer Mark Boling

Officer Cliff Hoffman

Officer Ronald Zalunardo

Officer Sean Konoske

Officer Edward Webb

Officer Pete Smith

Officer David Brown

Officer Drake Wiest

Officer Jason Underwood

Officer Ryan Rankin

Officer Telly Strika

Officer Brad Burrell

17 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bentley, Gregory L

Defendant Attorney

Kilday, Bruce A

 

Court Documents

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Singh, Mia; Paul Singh as successor-in-interest to decedent Misty Holt-Singh; Singh, Paul; Singh Jr., Paul. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

Non Opposition

Plaintiffs Non-Opposition to Stockton's Motion to Strike Portions of the Second Amended Complaint filed by Paul Singh, individually and as successor-in-interest to decedent Misty Holt-Singh. Action Type: Opposition; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

Opposition

Defendants' Opposition to Notice of Related Cases filed by City of Stockton, on it's own behalf and on behalf of its departments, including, but not limited to, the Stockton Police Department. Action Type: Opposition; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

TentativeRuling/ProbateNote.rtf

Tentative Ruling published. Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Officer Ryan Rankin served on 05/04/2016 by Personal Service. $49.95. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Officer Brad Burrell served on 05/04/2016 by Personal Service. $49.95. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Summons returned Unserved as to Officer Pete Smith. Costs $75.00 Not Served as Sued Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

Officer Defendants' Notice of Demurrer and Demurrer to Complaint

Officer Defendants' Notice of Demurrer and Demurrer to Complaint filed by City of Stockton, on it's own behalf and on behalf of its departments, including, but not limited to, the Stockton Police Department and all 32 individual Officers. Action Type: Motion or other paper requesting a hearing; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

Judgment of Dismissal - SURVIVAL ACTION signed by Judge Lofthus

Judgment of Dismissal - SURVIVAL ACTION signed by Judge Lofthus entered against Paul Singh as successor-in-interest to decedent Misty Holt-Singh, in favor of City of Stockton, on it's own behalf and on behalf of its departments, including, but not limited to, the Stockton Police Department, Officer Mark Boling, Officer David Brown, Officer Brad Burrell, Officer George Camacho, Officer Ralph Dominguez, Officer Pancho Freer, Officer Matthew Garlick, Officer Erika Gonzalez, Officer John Griffin, Officer Gabriel Guerrero, Officer David Hiland, Officer Cliff Hoffman, Officer Rodger Holscher, Officer Kevin Knall, Officer Sean Konoske, Officer Patrick Mayer, Officer Kristen McClure, Officer Julio Morales, Officer Ryan Morris, Officer Ryan Rankin, Officer Mike Rodriguez, Officer Ivan Rose, Officer Lance Saur, Officer Michael Serna, Officer Pete Smith, Officer Telly Strika, Officer Jason Underwood, Officer Neto Urias, Officer Samnang Ven, Officer Edward Webb, Officer Drake Wiest, Officer Ronald Zalunardo filed and entered. Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

Notice of Hearing

Hearing regarding: Motion to Strike Deft.'s Motion to Strike, set for 04/12/2017 at 9:00 AM before Hon. Linda L. Lofthus in Department 11. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Singh, Mia; Paul Singh, individually and as successor-in-interest to decedent Misty Holt-Singh; Singh Jr., Paul. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

Reply

Officer Defendants' Reply to Opposition to Demurrer to First Amended Complaint filed by City of Stockton, on it's own behalf and on behalf of its departments, including, but not limited to, the Stockton Police Department. Action Type: Reply; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

Clerk's Certificate of Service by Mail.rtf

Order Appointing Discovery Referee; on Plaintiffs' Motion for Discovery or Disclosure of Peace Officer personnel Records; Defendant's Request for Protective Order; and Court's Order to Show Cause Regarding Appointment of Discovery Referee; filed. Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

Deft. City of Stockton Notice of Demurrer

Deft. City of Stockton Notice of Demurrer and Demurrer to First Amended Complaint filed by City of Stockton, on it's own behalf and on behalf of its departments, including, but not limited to, the Stockton Police Department. Action Type: Demurrer; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

Reply

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply to Plaintiff's opposition filed by City of Stockton, on it's own behalf and on behalf of its departments, including, but not limited to, the Stockton Police Department. Action Type: Reply; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

TentativeRuling/ProbateNote.rtf

Tentative Ruling published. Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Officer Ryan Morris served on 05/04/2016 by Personal Service. $49.95. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

246 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/29/2018
  • HearingHearing Type: CMC: Request for Dismissal; Court Room: 10A; Result: Vacated; Judge: W. Stephen Scott; Participant: City of Stockton, on it's own behalf and on behalf of its departments, including, but not limited to, the Stockton Police Department (Defendant); Participant: Mia Singh (Plaintiff); Participant: Officer Brad Burrell (Defendant); Participant: Officer Cliff Hoffman (Defendant); Participant: Officer David Brown (Defendant); Participant: Officer David Hiland (Defendant); Participant: Officer Drake Wiest (Defendant); Participant: Officer Edward Webb (Defendant); Participant: Officer Erika Gonzalez (Defendant); Participant: Officer Gabriel Guerrero (Defendant); Participant: Officer George Camacho (Defendant); Participant: Officer Ivan Rose (Defendant); Participant: Officer Jason Underwood (Defendant); Participant: Officer John Griffin (Defendant); Participant: Officer Julio Morales (Defendant); Participant: Officer Kevin Knall (Defendant); Participant: Officer Kristen McClure (Defendant); Participant: Officer Lance Saur (Defendant); Participant: Officer Mark Boling (Defendant); Participant: Officer Matthew Garlick (Defendant); Participant: Officer Michael Serna (Defendant); Participant: Officer Mike Rodriguez (Defendant); Participant: Officer Neto Urias (Defendant); Participant: Officer Pancho Freer (Defendant); Participant: Officer Patrick Mayer (Defendant); Participant: Officer Pete Smith (Defendant); Participant: Officer Ralph Dominguez (Defendant); Participant: Officer Rodger Holscher (Defendant); Participant: Officer Ronald Zalunardo (Defendant); Participant: Officer Ryan Morris (Defendant); Participant: Officer Ryan Rankin (Defendant); Participant: Officer Samnang Ven (Defendant); Participant: Officer Sean Konoske (Defendant); Participant: Officer Telly Strika (Defendant); Participant: Paul Singh (Plaintiff); Participant: Paul Singh Jr. (Plaintiff); Participant: Paul Singh as successor-in-interest to decedent Misty Holt-Singh (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • DocketHearing Result: CMC Vacated Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • DocketCase status updated to Disposed. Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal - Entire Action as to Paul Singh as successor-in-interest to decedent Misty Holt-Singh, City of Stockton, on it's own behalf and on behalf of its departments, including, but not limited to, the Stockton Police Department, Officer Mark Boling, Officer David Brown, Officer Brad Burrell, Officer George Camacho, Officer Ralph Dominguez, Officer Pancho Freer, Officer Matthew Garlick, Officer Erika Gonzalez, Officer John Griffin, Officer Gabriel Guerrero, Officer David Hiland, Officer Cliff Hoffman, Officer Rodger Holscher, Officer Kevin Knall, Officer Sean Konoske, Officer Patrick Mayer, Officer Kristen McClure, Officer Julio Morales, Officer Ryan Morris, Officer Ryan Rankin, Officer Mike Rodriguez, Officer Ivan Rose, Officer Lance Saur, Officer Michael Serna, Officer Pete Smith, Officer Telly Strika, Officer Jason Underwood, Officer Neto Urias, Officer Samnang Ven, Officer Edward Webb, Officer Drake Wiest, Officer Ronald Zalunardo, Paul Singh Jr., Mia Singh, Paul Singh Entered. Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Singh, Paul; Singh Jr., Paul; Singh, Mia; Paul Singh as successor-in-interest to decedent Misty Holt-Singh. Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • DocketCase status updated to Appeal Disposed. Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRemittitur filed. Action Type: Remittitur filed; Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • HearingHearing Type: CMC: Request for Dismissal; Court Room: 10A; Result: Held; Judge: W. Stephen Scott; Participant: Paul Singh as successor-in-interest to decedent Misty Holt-Singh (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • DocketHearing re: CMC: Request for Dismissal held on July 25, 2018. Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for CMC: Request for Dismissal held on 07/25/2018 08:30 AM . Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

    Read MoreRead Less
350 More Docket Entries
  • 04/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPeremptory Challenge pursuant to CCP 170.6 as to Judge Kronlund filed by Plantiffs. Action Type: Peremptory Challenge pursuant to CCP 170.6; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Related Case filed by Paul Singh, individually and as successor-in-interest to decedent Misty Holt-Singh. Action Type: Notice of Related Case; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2016
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 10/14/2016 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 42. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2016
  • DocketPayment received by in the amount of $585.00. Receipt number 51609. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2016
  • DocketPayment received by in the amount of $585.00. Receipt number 51609. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Paul Singh, individually and as successor-in-interest to decedent Misty Holt-Singh. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Paul Singh, individually and as successor-in-interest to decedent Misty Holt-Singh. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2016
  • DocketAttorney, Gregory L Bentley, retained for Paul Singh, individually and as successor-in-interest to decedent Misty Holt-Singh . Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2016
  • DocketCase initiated. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BENTLEY GREGORY LAWRENCE