Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 23:39:23 (UTC).

Paul G. Aragon vs Joe Magana, Jr. et al.

Case Summary

On 11/23/2016 Paul G Aragon filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Joe Magana, Jr. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Sparks, Sheryle. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************1913

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Sparks, Sheryle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Aragon, Paul G.

Defendants

Magana, Jr., Joe

Silva, Julene

 

Court Documents

EJ130 Writ of Execution

Writ of Possession as to Julene Silva served on 01/05/2017 by Returned With Full Satisfaction. $145.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Default against Julene Silva Entered Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

UD110 Judgment- Unlawful Detainer

Clerk's Default Judgment for Possession for Paul G. Aragon against Julene Silva filed and entered Judgment applies to all occupants. See judgment filed herein. . Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Julene Silva served on 11/28/2016 by Substituted Service. $40.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal - Participant entered as to Joe Magana, Jr.. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Notice to Filing Party

12/15/2016: Notice to Filing Party

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of service as to ALL OCCUPANTS filed by Aragon, Paul G.. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Summons returned Unserved as to Julene Silva. Costs Invalid and Incomplete. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal filed by Aragon, Paul G.. NOT ENTERED. Participant is not a named Defendant. Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Dismissal filed by Aragon, Paul G.. NOT ENTERED. Participant is not a named Defendant. Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Declaration

Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010 filed by Aragon, Paul G.. Action Type: Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

SUM130 Summons - Unlawful Detainer

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Unlawful Detainer; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Complaint

Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000) filed by Aragon, Paul G.. Action Type: Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Aragon, Paul G.. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

NoticethatYouHaveBeenSued.rtf

Notice That You Have Been Sued. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Possession as to Julene Silva served on 01/05/2017 by Returned With Full Satisfaction. $145.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • Writ of Possession issued as to Julene Silva on 12/16/2016 to San Joaquin County. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • Case status updated to Disposed. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Default Judgment for Possession for Paul G. Aragon against Julene Silva filed and entered Judgment applies to all occupants. See judgment filed herein. . Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Default against Julene Silva Entered Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • Payment received by Paul Aragon in the amount of $25.00. Receipt number 127412. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal - Participant entered as to Joe Magana, Jr.. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to Julene Silva served on 11/28/2016 by Substituted Service. $40.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • Request for Dismissal filed by Aragon, Paul G.. Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010 filed by Aragon, Paul G.. Action Type: Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal filed by Aragon, Paul G.. NOT ENTERED. Participant is not a named Defendant. Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • Request for Default against Julene Silva Not Entered. ALL OCCUPANTS ENTERED. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons returned Unserved as to Julene Silva. Costs Invalid and Incomplete. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of service as to ALL OCCUPANTS filed by Aragon, Paul G.. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Unlawful Detainer; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Aragon, Paul G.. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000) filed by Aragon, Paul G.. Action Type: Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice That You Have Been Sued. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2016
  • Payment received by Paul Aragon in the amount of $240.00. Receipt number 122116. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less