Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 08/10/2018 at 11:07:58 (UTC).

Paul Cachopo vs. Vera R. Susich

Case Summary

On 01/12/2009 Paul Cachopo filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Vera R Susich. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Lodi Branch Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Urie, Phillip. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************0355

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lodi Branch Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Urie, Phillip

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cachopo, Paul

Defendants

Wilkerson, Phyllis

Susich, Vera R.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

McGladdery, Jonathan

 

Court Documents

Notice of Entry of Judgment -Civil

02/25/2009: Notice of Entry of Judgment -Civil

Notice of Entry of Judgment -Civil

02/25/2009: Notice of Entry of Judgment -Civil

Payment Receipt

02/24/2009: Payment Receipt

Minute Order

02/23/2009: Minute Order

Notice of Hearing San Joaquin

02/11/2009: Notice of Hearing San Joaquin

Notice of Hearing San Joaquin

02/11/2009: Notice of Hearing San Joaquin

Notice that you have been sued

01/13/2009: Notice that you have been sued

Payment Receipt

01/12/2009: Payment Receipt

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2009
  • Milestone of Disposition 30 days met late. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2009
  • Milestone of Disposition 45 days met timely. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2009
  • Automatic UD Disposition Clock has expired. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2009
  • Writ has been updated. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2009
  • The status of has been updated to Fully Satisfied. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2009
  • Writ of Possession Returned filed by Cachopo, Paul on 04/06/2009. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2009
  • Automatic Proof of Service Clock has expired. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2009
  • Case security level updated to 1 effective $CHANGEDATE. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2009
  • Status of Paul Cachopo updated to Disposed. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2009
  • Status of Vera Susich updated to Disposed. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
52 More Docket Entries
  • 01/12/2009
  • Automatic UD Disposition Clock started. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2009
  • Case has been initiated. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2009
  • Volume 1 created and added to case file with an ROA Start Date of 01/12/2009. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2009
  • Payment received for 31 - Complaint or other 1st paper <=$10K (UD) in the amount of 215.00 on 01/12/2009, transaction number 249896 and receipt number 44190. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2009
  • Address for Jonathan McGladdery selected. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2009
  • Case initiation form printed. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2009
  • Summons issued. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2009
  • Case assigned to Department L2. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2009
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Cachopo, Paul on 01/12/2009. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2009
  • Complaint filed by Cachopo, Paul on 01/12/2009. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer McGladdery, Jonathan