This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 05/12/2020 at 06:38:23 (UTC).

Patricia Herrera Hernandez vs Gurpinderpal Kaur Gill

Case Summary

On 09/18/2019 Patricia Herrera Hernandez filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Gurpinderpal Kaur Gill. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ross, Roger. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************2262

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Ross, Roger

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Herrera Hernandez, Patricia

Defendant

Kaur Gill, Gurpinderpal

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Fields, Willard Russell

Defendant Attorney

Oneal, Jeffery F

 

Court Documents

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 03/16/2020 08:30 AM . Judge: Ross, Roger.

Notice to Filing Party

02/27/2020: Notice to Filing Party

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Kaur Gill, Gurpinderpal. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Ross, Roger.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Herrera Hernandez, Patricia. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Ross, Roger.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Gurpinderpal Kaur Gill served on 12/13/2019 by Personal Service. $75.00. Judge: Ross, Roger.

Answer

Answer on Behalf of Defendant Gurpinderpal Kaur Gill to Plaintiff's Complaint for Motor Vehicle Personal Injury-----------First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000) filed by Kaur Gill, Gurpinderpal. Action Type: First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000); Judge: Ross, Roger.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Herrera Hernandez, Patricia. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Ross, Roger.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Ross, Roger.

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Herrera Hernandez, Patricia. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Ross, Roger.

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Ross, Roger.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2021
  • HearingHearing Type: Jury Trial; Court Room: 11B; Judge: Roger Ross; Participant: Gurpinderpal Kaur Gill (Defendant); Participant: Patricia Herrera Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • HearingHearing Type: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Court Room: 11B; Judge: Roger Ross; Participant: Gurpinderpal Kaur Gill (Defendant); Participant: Patricia Herrera Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Court Room: 11B; Result: Held; Judge: Roger Ross; Participant: Gurpinderpal Kaur Gill (Defendant); Participant: Patricia Herrera Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 03/16/2020 08:30 AM . Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketHearing regarding: Jury Trial Assignment (est 3-4 days), set for 04/12/2021 at 1:30 PM before Hon. Roger Ross in Department 11B. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketHearing regarding: Mandatory Settlement Conference , set for 03/08/2021 at 2:30 PM before Hon. Roger Ross in Department 11B. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketHearing re: Case Management Conference held on March 16, 2020. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Kaur Gill, Gurpinderpal. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketPayment received by Gurpinderpal Kaur Gill in the amount of $150.00. Receipt number 540717. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Herrera Hernandez, Patricia. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer on Behalf of Defendant Gurpinderpal Kaur Gill to Plaintiff's Complaint for Motor Vehicle Personal Injury-----------First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000) filed by Kaur Gill, Gurpinderpal. Action Type: First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000); Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketPayment received by Gurpinderpal Kaur Gill in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 519271. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 03/16/2020 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Roger Ross in Department 11B. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Herrera Hernandez, Patricia. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Herrera Hernandez, Patricia. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketPayment received by Patricia Herrera Hernandez in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 474069. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketAttorney, Willard Russell Fields, retained for Patricia Herrera Hernandez . Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketCase initiated. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.