This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/18/2018 at 02:24:04 (UTC).

Pasquale D'Onofrio vs Kim Rome et al.

Case Summary

On 08/30/2017 Pasquale D'Onofrio filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Kim Rome. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Lodi Branch Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Urie, Phillip. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************9082

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Urie, Phillip

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

D'Onofrio, Pasquale

Defendants

Rome, John

Rome, Kim

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Echols, Paul E

 

Court Documents

NoticethatYouHaveBeenSued.rtf

Notice That You Have Been Sued. Judge: Urie, Phillip.

UnlawfulDetainerNoticetoFilingParty.rtf

Unlawful Detainer Notice to Filing Party. Judge: Urie, Phillip.

Complaint

Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000) filed by D'Onofrio, Pasquale. Action Type: Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Urie, Phillip.

SUM130 Summons - Unlawful Detainer

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Unlawful Detainer; Judge: Urie, Phillip.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by D'Onofrio, Pasquale. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Urie, Phillip.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to John Rome served on 09/02/2017 by Substituted Service. $40.00. Judge: Urie, Phillip.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Kim Rome served on 09/02/2017 by Substituted Service. $40.00. Judge: Urie, Phillip.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of service as to All Occupants c/o Kim Rome 8/30/2017 with posting $40.00 filed by D'Onofrio, Pasquale. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Urie, Phillip.

UD110 Judgment- Unlawful Detainer

Clerk's Default Judgment for Possession for Pasquale D'Onofrio against Kim Rome, John Rome filed and entered Judgment applies to all occupants. See judgment filed herein. . Judge: Urie, Phillip.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Default against Kim Rome, John Rome entered and filed/includes all occupants. Judge: Urie, Phillip.

Declaration for Issuance of Writ of Possession pursuant to CCP 712.010

Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010 filed by D'Onofrio, Pasquale. Action Type: Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010; Judge: Urie, Phillip.

Writ Return

Writ of Possession as to Kim Rome and John Rome served on 09/28/2017 returned With Full Satisfaction. $145.00. Judge: Urie, Phillip.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Possession as to Kim Rome and John Rome served on 09/28/2017 returned With Full Satisfaction. $145.00. Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • Case status updated to Disposed. Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • Writ of Possession issued as to Kim Rome and John Rome on 09/19/2017 to San Joaquin County. Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Default Judgment for Possession for Pasquale D'Onofrio against Kim Rome, John Rome filed and entered Judgment applies to all occupants. See judgment filed herein. . Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Default against Kim Rome, John Rome entered and filed/includes all occupants. Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010 filed by D'Onofrio, Pasquale. Action Type: Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010; Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • Payment received by Pasquale D'Onofrio in the amount of $25.00. Receipt number 211337. Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to John Rome served on 09/02/2017 by Substituted Service. $40.00. Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of service as to All Occupants c/o Kim Rome 8/30/2017 with posting $40.00 filed by D'Onofrio, Pasquale. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to Kim Rome served on 09/02/2017 by Substituted Service. $40.00. Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • Attorney, Paul E Echols, retained for Pasquale D'Onofrio . Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Unlawful Detainer Notice to Filing Party. Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice That You Have Been Sued. Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • Case initiated. Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000) filed by D'Onofrio, Pasquale. Action Type: Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • Payment received by Pasquale D'Onofrio in the amount of $240.00. Receipt number 204640. Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Unlawful Detainer; Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by D'Onofrio, Pasquale. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Echols, Paul E