This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 01:00:39 (UTC).

Paseo Villas Apartments LLC vs Vance Thompson

Case Summary

On 06/05/2018 Paseo Villas Apartments LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Vance Thompson. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Manteca Branch Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Sparks, Sheryle. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************6549

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Sparks, Sheryle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Paseo Villas Apartments LLC

Defendant

Thompson, Vance

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Echols, Paul E

 

Court Documents

UnlawfulDetainerNoticetoFilingParty.rtf

Unlawful Detainer Notice to Filing Party. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

NoticethatYouHaveBeenSued.rtf

Notice That You Have Been Sued. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Paseo Villas Apartments LLC. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

SUM130 Summons - Unlawful Detainer

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Unlawful Detainer; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Complaint

Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000) filed by Paseo Villas Apartments LLC. Action Type: Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Default against Vance Thompson Entered Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to All Occupants in care of Vance Thompson served on 06/06/2018 by Substituted Service, Posting and Mailing. $40.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Vance Thompson served on 06/06/2018 by Personal Service. $40.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Clerk Default as to All Occupants filed by Paseo Villas Apartments LLC. ENTERED Action Type: Request for Entry of Clerk Judgment; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Declaration for Issuance of Writ of Possession pursuant to CCP 712.010

Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010 filed by Paseo Villas Apartments LLC. Action Type: Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

UD110 Judgment- Unlawful Detainer

Clerk's Default Judgment for Possession for Paseo Villas Apartments LLC against Vance Thompson filed and entered . Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Writ Return

Writ of Possession as to Vance Thompson served on 07/11/2018 by Returned With Full Satisfaction. $145.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Declaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585

Declaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585 filed by Paseo Villas Apartments LLC. Action Type: Declaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Court Judgment filed by Paseo Villas Apartments LLC. Action Type: Request for Entry of Court Judgment; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

UD110 Judgment- Unlawful Detainer

Judgment for Money After Possession - UD entered and filed. Total judgment amount $4,848.97. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

05/26/2019

DocketCase status updated to Closed. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/31/2018
View Court Documents

DocketJudgment for Money After Possession - UD entered and filed. Total judgment amount $4,848.97. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/14/2018
View Court Documents

DocketRequest for Entry of Court Judgment filed by Paseo Villas Apartments LLC. Action Type: Request for Entry of Court Judgment; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/14/2018
View Court Documents

DocketDeclaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585 filed by Paseo Villas Apartments LLC. Action Type: Declaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/23/2018
View Court Documents

DocketWrit of Possession as to Vance Thompson served on 07/11/2018 by Returned With Full Satisfaction. $145.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/25/2018

DocketCase status updated to Disposed. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/25/2018
View Court Documents

DocketClerk's Default Judgment for Possession for Paseo Villas Apartments LLC against Vance Thompson filed and entered . Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/25/2018

DocketWrit of Possession issued as to Vance Thompson on 06/25/2018 to . Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/25/2018

DocketPayment received by G.O.N.E. , Inc. in the amount of $25.00. Receipt number 306475. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/22/2018
View Court Documents

DocketDeclaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010 filed by Paseo Villas Apartments LLC. Action Type: Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
06/18/2018
View Court Documents

DocketRequest for Default against Vance Thompson Entered Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/18/2018

DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Default Judgment filed by Paseo Villas Apartments LLC. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/05/2018

DocketAttorney, Paul E Echols, retained for Paseo Villas Apartments LLC . Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/05/2018
View Court Documents

DocketComplaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000) filed by Paseo Villas Apartments LLC. Action Type: Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/05/2018
View Court Documents

DocketSummons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Unlawful Detainer; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/05/2018
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Paseo Villas Apartments LLC. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/05/2018
View Court Documents

DocketUnlawful Detainer Notice to Filing Party. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/05/2018
View Court Documents

DocketNotice That You Have Been Sued. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/05/2018

DocketCase initiated. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/05/2018

DocketPayment received by G.O.N.E., Inc in the amount of $240.00. Receipt number 299891. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less