This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 09/18/2023 at 19:00:13 (UTC).

Pascual Martin Xuncax vs Alida Cornelia Vanryn

Case Summary

On 01/09/2023 Pascual Martin Xuncax filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Alida Cornelia Vanryn. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Guy Castillo, Erin. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************0160

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Guy Castillo, Erin

 

Court Documents

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed.

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Xuncax, Pascual Martin.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Xuncax, Pascual Martin.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Alida Cornelia Vanryn served on 03/09/2023 by Substituted Service. $284.72.

Notice of Hearing

Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 12/11/2023 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Erin Guy Castillo in Department 10B.

Notice of Hearing

Hearing regarding: CMC: Request for Dismissal , set for 07/06/2023 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Erin Guy Castillo in Department 10B.

CM200 Notice of Settlement of Entire Case

Notice of Settlement - Unconditional filed by Xuncax, Pascual Martin.

Declaration

Declaration of Danielle R. Farah Regarding Failure to File Request for Dismissal filed by Xuncax, Pascual Martin.

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal filed by Xuncax, Pascual Martin.

Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal with prejudice NOT ENTERED filed by Xuncax, Pascual Martin.

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal - Entire Action as to Pascual Martin Xuncax, Alida Cornelia Vanryn Entered.

 

Docket Entries

12/11/2023

HearingHearing Type: CMC: Request for Dismissal; Court Room: 10B; Result: Vacated; Judge: Erin Guy Castillo; Participants; Alida Cornelia Vanryn (Defendant); Pascual Martin Xuncax (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/11/2023

HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10B; Result: Vacated; Judge: Erin Guy Castillo; Participants; Alida Cornelia Vanryn (Defendant); Pascual Martin Xuncax (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2023

DocketHearing Result: Vacated; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/17/2023

DocketCase status updated to Disposed.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/31/2023
View Court Documents

DocketRequest for Dismissal with prejudice NOT ENTERED filed by Xuncax, Pascual Martin.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/17/2023
View Court Documents

DocketRequest for Dismissal - Entire Action as to Pascual Martin Xuncax, Alida Cornelia Vanryn Entered.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/17/2023
View Court Documents

DocketRequest for Dismissal filed by Xuncax, Pascual Martin.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2023

HearingHearing Type: CMC: Request for Dismissal; Court Room: 10B; Result: Reset - Court's Motion; Judge: Erin Guy Castillo; Participants; Alida Cornelia Vanryn (Defendant); Pascual Martin Xuncax (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2023

HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10B; Result: Continued-Court's Motion; Judge: Erin Guy Castillo; Participants; Alida Cornelia Vanryn (Defendant); Pascual Martin Xuncax (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/27/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDeclaration of Danielle R. Farah Regarding Failure to File Request for Dismissal filed by Xuncax, Pascual Martin.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
05/16/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Settlement - Unconditional filed by Xuncax, Pascual Martin.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/14/2023
View Court Documents

DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Alida Cornelia Vanryn served on 03/09/2023 by Substituted Service. $284.72.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/10/2023

DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 07/06/2023 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Erin Guy Castillo in Department 10B.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSummons issued and filed.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Xuncax, Pascual Martin.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketComplaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Xuncax, Pascual Martin.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023

DocketPayment received by Pascual Xuncax in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 802532.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023

DocketAttorney, Danielle R Farahi, retained for Pascual Martin Xuncax .; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023

DocketCase initiated.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

[+] Read More [-] Read Less