This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/30/2018 at 20:10:07 (UTC).

Park Place Apartments Manteca vs. Shirley Paschal

Case Summary

On 07/30/2012 Park Place Apartments Manteca filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Shirley Paschal. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts , Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Mulvihill, Michael. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************9315

  • Filing Date:

    07/30/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Mulvihill, Michael

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Park Place Apartments Manteca

Defendant

Paschal, Shirley

 

Court Documents

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process)

06/03/2014: Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process)

Payment Receipt

07/30/2012: Payment Receipt

Notice that you have been sued

07/30/2012: Notice that you have been sued

 

Docket Entries

07/03/2014

location changed from Courthouse to Offsite,Records Management Judge: CONVERSION.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/01/2014

Milestone of Disposition 30 days met late. Judge: CONVERSION.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/01/2014

Milestone of Disposition 45 days met late. Judge: CONVERSION.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/30/2014

Complaint associated on 06/30/2014. Judge: CONVERSION.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/30/2014

Complaint disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. Judge: CONVERSION.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/30/2014

Status of Park Place Apartments Manteca updated to Dismissed without Prejudice. Judge: CONVERSION.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/30/2014

Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. Judge: CONVERSION.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/30/2014

Status of Shirley Paschal updated to Dismissed without Prejudice. Judge: CONVERSION.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/30/2014

Motion - Other (CLM) - RE OSC scheduled for 08/28/2014 at 03:00:00 PM in M2 was vacated. Judge: CONVERSION.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/30/2014

Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. Judge: CONVERSION.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
34 More Docket Entries
07/30/2012

Case initiation form printed. Judge: CONVERSION.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/30/2012

Case initiation completed. Judge: CONVERSION.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/30/2012

Automatic UD Disposition Clock started. Judge: CONVERSION.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/30/2012

Automatic Failure to File Default Clock started. Judge: CONVERSION.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/30/2012

Automatic Proof of Service Clock started. Judge: CONVERSION.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/30/2012

Summons issued. Judge: CONVERSION.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/30/2012

Case assigned to Department M2. Judge: CONVERSION.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/30/2012

Original Summons filed by Park Place Apartments Manteca on 07/30/2012. Judge: CONVERSION.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/30/2012

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Park Place Apartments Manteca on 07/30/2012. Judge: CONVERSION.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/30/2012

Complaint filed by Park Place Apartments Manteca on 07/30/2012. Judge: CONVERSION.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less