Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/30/2018 at 14:11:11 (UTC).

Park Place Apartments Manteca vs. Debra Brasfield

Case Summary

On 05/08/2012 Park Place Apartments Manteca filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Debra Brasfield. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Mulvihill, Michael. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************5584

  • Filing Date:

    05/08/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Mulvihill, Michael

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Park Place Apartments Manteca

Defendant

Brasfield, Debra

 

Court Documents

Payment Receipt

06/22/2012: Payment Receipt

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

06/11/2012: CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Notice of Hearing

06/05/2012: Notice of Hearing

Payment Receipt

06/05/2012: Payment Receipt

Notice to Filing Party

06/01/2012: Notice to Filing Party

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

05/30/2012: CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Notice That You've Been Sued

05/08/2012: Notice That You've Been Sued

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

05/08/2012: CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice that you have been sued

05/08/2012: Notice that you have been sued

Declaration

07/03/2012: Declaration

EJ130 Writ of Execution

06/22/2012: EJ130 Writ of Execution

Minute Order

06/15/2012: Minute Order

Notice of Hearing San Joaquin

06/05/2012: Notice of Hearing San Joaquin

UD150 Request/Counter-Request to Set Case

05/30/2012: UD150 Request/Counter-Request to Set Case

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

05/30/2012: POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

FW003 Order on Court Fee Waiver

05/18/2012: FW003 Order on Court Fee Waiver

SUM130 Summons - Unlawful Detainer

05/08/2012: SUM130 Summons - Unlawful Detainer

UD100 Complaint

05/08/2012: UD100 Complaint

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/18/2013
  • location changed from Courthouse to Offsite,Records Management Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2012
  • Writ has been updated. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2012
  • Case security level updated to 1 effective . Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2012
  • Complaint (granting stay of eviction. See file for details) associated on 07/03/2012. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2012
  • Judgment by Court - After Trial (of eviction along with proof of service) associated on 07/03/2012. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2012
  • Status of Debra Brasfield updated to Active/Self-Represented. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2012
  • Order - Other (granting stay of eviction. See file for details) filed by Brasfield, Debra on 07/03/2012. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2012
  • Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Brasfield, Debra on 07/03/2012. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2012
  • Ex Parte Application for Stay (of eviction along with proof of service) filed by Brasfield, Debra on 07/03/2012. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2012
  • Payment received for 141I - Writ in the amount of 25.00 on 06/22/2012, transaction number 1008227 and receipt number 268478. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
89 More Docket Entries
  • 05/08/2012
  • Cause of Action number 1 added. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2012
  • Automatic UD Disposition Clock started. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2012
  • Automatic Failure to File Default Clock started. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2012
  • Automatic Proof of Service Clock started. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2012
  • Case initiation completed. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2012
  • Summons issued. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2012
  • Case assigned to Department M2. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2012
  • Original Summons filed by Park Place Apartments Manteca on 05/08/2012. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2012
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Park Place Apartments Manteca on 05/08/2012. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2012
  • Complaint filed by Park Place Apartments Manteca on 05/08/2012. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PARK PLACE APARTMENTS is a litigant