This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 06/02/2023 at 17:02:49 (UTC).

Pamela Stewart House vs Kurtis Hansell

Case Summary

On 09/06/2022 Pamela Stewart House filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against Kurtis Hansell. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Manteca Branch Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Agbayani, Tony J.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************7779

  • Filing Date:

    09/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Agbayani, Tony J.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

House, Pamela Stewart

Respondent

Hansell, Kurtis

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Moore, Michael K.

Respondent Attorney

Sodhi, Jakrun S

 

Court Documents

Minute_Order.rtf

Minutes finalized for OSC Re: Harassment held on 05/16/2023 10:00 AM .

CH116A MP Notice of New Hearing Date and Order on Reissuance Amended

The Court Orders the Notice of New Hearing and Order on Reissuance Granted on 04/18/2023. See Order filed herein.

Minute_Order.rtf

Minutes finalized for OSC Re: Harassment held on 04/18/2023 10:00 AM .

CH116 MP Notice of New Hearing Date and Order on Reissuance

The Court Orders the Notice of New Hearing and Order on Reissuance Granted on 04/18/2023. See Order filed herein.

CH116 MP Notice of New Hearing Date and Order on Reissuance

The Court Orders the Notice of New Hearing and Order on Reissuance Entered on 01/10/2023. See Order filed herein.

Minute_Order.rtf

Minutes finalized for OSC Re: Harassment held on 01/10/2023 10:30 AM .

CH116 MP Notice of New Hearing Date and Order on Reissuance

The Court Orders the Notice of New Hearing and Order on Reissuance Entered on 12/02/2022. See Order filed herein.

Minute_Order.rtf

Minutes finalized for OSC Re: Harassment held on 12/02/2022 10:30 AM .

CH116 MP Notice of New Hearing Date and Order on Reissuance

Order on Request to Continue Hearing filed by Pamela Stewart House, Kurtis Hansell.

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2023
  • DocketPayment received in the amount of $1.00, receipt number 835214.; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: OSC Re: Harassment; Court Room: M2; Result: Held; Judge: Esmeralda Zendejas

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • DocketCourt Finding filed.; Judge: Zendejas, Esmeralda

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • DocketHearing re: OSC Re: Harassment held on May 16, 2023.; Judge: Zendejas, Esmeralda

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for OSC Re: Harassment held on 05/16/2023 10:00 AM .; Judge: Zendejas, Esmeralda

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: OSC Re: Harassment; Court Room: M2; Result: Continued-Court's Motion; Judge: Tony J. Agbayani

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • DocketHearing regarding: OSC Re: Harassment , set for 05/16/2023 at 10:00 AM before Hon. Esmeralda Zendejas in Department M2.; Judge: Zendejas, Esmeralda

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for OSC Re: Harassment held on 04/18/2023 10:00 AM .; Judge: Zendejas, Esmeralda

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketThe Court Orders the Notice of New Hearing and Order on Reissuance Granted on 04/18/2023. See Order filed herein.; Judge: Zendejas, Esmeralda

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • DocketOSC Re: Harassment scheduled on 04/18/2023 at 10:00 AM has been Continued.; Judge: Zendejas, Esmeralda

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by Sheriff (Fee Waived) as to Kurtis Hansell served on 09/15/2022 by Personal Service. $0.00.; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Firearms Turned In, Sold or Stored filed by Hansell, Kurtis.; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketPayment received in the amount of $1.00, receipt number 772292.; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketHearing regarding: OSC Re: Harassment , set for 10/04/2022 at 10:30 AM before Hon. Tony J. Agbayani in Department M2.; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Court Hearing - TRO filed by Pamela Stewart House.; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order Granted and filed on 09/07/2022.; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Restraining Order Notice to Filing Party.; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketCase initiated.; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Orders to Stop Harassment with Violence (Civil Harassment) filed by House, Pamela Stewart.; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by House, Pamela Stewart.; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less