Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/17/2018 at 11:11:54 (UTC).

Pamela Johnson et al. vs Jose Sanchez et al.

Case Summary

On 01/09/2017 Pamela Johnson filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Jose Sanchez. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Holly, Carter. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************0197

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Holly, Carter

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Johnson, Nichole

Johnson, Pamela

Defendants

Sanchez, Jose

Sanchez, Salvador

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Cohen, Michael C

Defendant Attorney

Shaw, Paula M.

 

Court Documents

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Dismissal - Entire Action as to Pamela Johnson, Nichole Johnson, Jose Sanchez, Salvador Sanchez Entered. Judge: Holly, Carter.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on 12/13/2017 08:45 AM . Judge: Holly, Carter.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Johnson, Pamela; Johnson, Nichole. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Holly, Carter.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Sanchez, Salvador. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Holly, Carter.

Notice of Hearing

07/13/2017: Notice of Hearing

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 07/13/2017 08:45 AM . Judge: Holly, Carter.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Sanchez, Salvador. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Holly, Carter.

Demand for Jury Trial

Defendant Salvador Sanchez' Demand for Jury Trial filed by Sanchez, Salvador. Action Type: Demand for Jury Trial; Judge: Holly, Carter.

Answer

Defendant Salvador Sanchez' Answer to Complaint filed by Sanchez, Salvador. Action Type: First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000); Judge: Holly, Carter.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Salvador Sanchez served on 01/17/2017 by Substituted Service. $104.85. Judge: Holly, Carter.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Jose Sanchez served on 01/17/2017 by Substituted Service. $104.85. Judge: Holly, Carter.

Complaint

Complaint -Motor Vehicle - Personal Injury filed by Johnson, Pamela; Johnson, Nichole. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Holly, Carter.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Johnson, Pamela; Johnson, Nichole. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Holly, Carter.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Holly, Carter.

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Holly, Carter.

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2018
  • Case status updated to Disposed. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • Hearing Result: Vacated Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal - Entire Action as to Pamela Johnson, Nichole Johnson, Jose Sanchez, Salvador Sanchez Entered. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Johnson, Nichole; Johnson, Pamela. Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • Hearing regarding: CMC: Further Case Management Conference RE Dismissal Review, set for 02/15/2018 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Carter Holly in Department 10B. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on 12/13/2017 08:45 AM . Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • Hearing re: CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on December 13, 2017. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Statement filed by Johnson, Pamela; Johnson, Nichole. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Statement filed by Sanchez, Salvador. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • Hearing re: Case Management Conference held on July 13, 2017. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 01/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to Salvador Sanchez served on 01/17/2017 by Substituted Service. $104.85. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to Jose Sanchez served on 01/17/2017 by Substituted Service. $104.85. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • Case initiated. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint -Motor Vehicle - Personal Injury filed by Johnson, Pamela; Johnson, Nichole. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • Payment received by Pamela Johnson in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 132297. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • Attorney, Michael C Cohen, retained for Pamela Johnson . Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • Attorney, Michael C Cohen, retained for Nichole Johnson . Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Johnson, Pamela; Johnson, Nichole. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHAW, PAULA M.