Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 06/06/2021 at 02:49:22 (UTC).

Pale Taufoa vs San Joaquin County et al.

Case Summary

On 04/12/2021 Pale Taufoa filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against San Joaquin County. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kronlund, Barbara. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************3136

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kronlund, Barbara

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Taufoa, Pale

Defendants

San Joaquin County

Invergo D.O., D.

San Joaquin General Hospital

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Haley, Esq., Matthew D.

Defendant Attorney

Jimerson, Curtis E

 

Court Documents

Answer to Complaint

Answer to Complaint (amount over $25,000) filed by Invergo D.O., D.; San Joaquin County; San Joaquin General Hospital. Action Type: First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000); Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Demand for Jury Trial

Demand for Jury Trial filed by Invergo D.O., D.; San Joaquin General Hospital; San Joaquin County. Action Type: Demand for Jury Trial; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service of Summons as to D. Invergo D.O. served on 05/04/2021 by Substituted Service. $94.83. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service of Summons as to San Joaquin General Hospital served on 05/03/2021 by Substituted Service. $58.83. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to San Joaquin County served on 04/29/2021 by Substituted Service. $94.83. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Taufoa, Pale. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Taufoa, Pale. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2021
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10D; Judge: Barbara Kronlund; Participant: D. Invergo D.O. (Defendant); Participant: Pale Taufoa (Plaintiff); Participant: San Joaquin County (Defendant); Participant: San Joaquin General Hospital (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint (amount over $25,000) filed by Invergo D.O., D.; San Joaquin County; San Joaquin General Hospital. Action Type: First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000); Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial filed by Invergo D.O., D.; San Joaquin General Hospital; San Joaquin County. Action Type: Demand for Jury Trial; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketPayment received by San Joaquin General Hospital in the amount of $150.00. Receipt number 647995. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketAttorney, Curtis E Jimerson, retained for San Joaquin General Hospital . Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketAttorney, Curtis E Jimerson, retained for San Joaquin County . Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketAttorney, Curtis E Jimerson, retained for D. Invergo D.O. . Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to D. Invergo D.O. served on 05/04/2021 by Substituted Service. $94.83. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to San Joaquin General Hospital served on 05/03/2021 by Substituted Service. $58.83. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to San Joaquin County served on 04/29/2021 by Substituted Service. $94.83. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 10/08/2021 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 10D. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketAttorney, Matthew D. Haley, Esq., retained for Pale Taufoa . Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Taufoa, Pale. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Taufoa, Pale. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketPayment received by Pale Taufoa in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 636601. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketCase initiated. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HALEY, MATTHEW D.