This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 11/20/2021 at 10:26:13 (UTC).

Pacific Gas and Electric Company, a California Corporation vs Precision Excavating & Drilling, Inc., a California Corporation

Case Summary

On 11/08/2021 Pacific Gas and Electric Company, a California Corporation filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Precision Excavating Drilling, Inc , a California Corporation. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lee, Jayne. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************0416

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Lee, Jayne

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Pacific Gas and Electric Company, a California Corporation

Defendant

Precision Excavating & Drilling, Inc., a California Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Urrabazo, Donald S

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Lee, Jayne.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Pacific Gas and Electric Company, a California Corporation. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Lee, Jayne.

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Pacific Gas and Electric Company, a California Corporation. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Lee, Jayne.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Lee, Jayne.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Precision Excavating & Drilling, Inc., a California Corporation served on 11/11/2021 by Substituted Service. $241.51. Judge: Lee, Jayne.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2022
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10C; Judge: Jayne Lee; Participant: Pacific Gas and Electric Company, a California Corporation (Plaintiff); Participant: Precision Excavating & Drilling, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Precision Excavating & Drilling, Inc., a California Corporation served on 11/11/2021 by Substituted Service. $241.51. Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 05/09/2022 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Jayne Lee in Department 10C. Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Pacific Gas and Electric Company, a California Corporation. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Pacific Gas and Electric Company, a California Corporation. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketPayment received by a Pacific Gas and Electric Company in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 695292. Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketAttorney, Donald S Urrabazo, retained for Pacific Gas and Electric Company, a California Corporation . Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketCase initiated. Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Pacific Gas and Electric Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Urrabazo, Donald S