Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 08/02/2018 at 11:05:24 (UTC).

Pacific Credit Exchange A Corporation vs. Shirley P Padilla

Case Summary

On 02/16/2011 Pacific Credit Exchange A Corporation filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Shirley P Padilla. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Tracy Branch Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************2560

  • Filing Date:

    02/16/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tracy Branch Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Pacific Credit Exchange A Corporation

Defendants

Padilla, Shirley P

Padilla, Carlito C

 

Court Documents

Payment Receipt

07/10/2012: Payment Receipt

Payment Receipt

08/16/2011: Payment Receipt

Payment Receipt - Void

08/11/2011: Payment Receipt - Void

Void Payment Acknowledgement

08/11/2011: Void Payment Acknowledgement

Payment Receipt

07/06/2011: Payment Receipt

Minute Order

06/06/2011: Minute Order

Notice of Hearing San Joaquin

04/22/2011: Notice of Hearing San Joaquin

Payment Receipt

04/22/2011: Payment Receipt

Payment Receipt

02/17/2011: Payment Receipt

Notice of Case Assignment Scheduling Information and Notice of Hearing

02/17/2011: Notice of Case Assignment Scheduling Information and Notice of Hearing

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/10/2012
  • Payment received for 141I - Writ in the amount of 25.00 on 07/10/2012, transaction number 1016013 and receipt number 270483. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2012
  • Writ issued. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2012
  • Costs acknowledged/updated. Judgment total updated to 5774.39. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2012
  • Postjudgment credits acknowledged in the amount of 1000.00. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2012
  • Postjudgment interest accrued 492.05. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2012
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed by Pacific Credit Exchange A Corporation on 07/02/2012. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2011
  • location changed from Courthouse to Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Rm 303 Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2011
  • Disbursement to Pacific Credit Exchange issued in the amount of 225.00 due to Over payment. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2011
  • Payment received for 173 - Answer or other 1st paper <=$10K, T17 - Overpayment greater than $10 in the amount of 450.00 on 08/16/2011, transaction number 845967 and receipt number 226250. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2011
  • Fee for T17 - Overpayment greater than $10, transaction number 1280581 created on 08/12/2011 canceled due to Other. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
86 More Docket Entries
  • 02/17/2011
  • Address for Frank Blundo selected. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2011
  • Cause of Action number 1 added. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2011
  • Automatic Limited Case Disposition Clock started. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2011
  • Automatic Failure to File Default Clock started. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2011
  • Automatic Proof of Service Clock started. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2011
  • Summons issued. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2011
  • Case assigned to Department T1. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2011
  • Original Summons filed by Pacific Credit Exchange A Corporation on 02/16/2011. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2011
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Pacific Credit Exchange A Corporation on 02/16/2011. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2011
  • Complaint filed by Pacific Credit Exchange A Corporation on 02/16/2011. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PACIFIC CREDIT EXCHANGE A CORPORATION is a litigant