This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 11/17/2019 at 03:14:41 (UTC).

Pacific Coast Supply, LLC vs Platinum Roofing, Inc. et al.

Case Summary

On 09/18/2019 a Contract - Debt Collection case was filed by Pacific Coast Supply, LLC against Platinum Roofing, Inc in the jurisdiction of San Joaquin County Superior Courts , Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************2319

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Mulvihill, Michael

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Pacific Coast Supply, LLC

Defendants

Plymouth Place Inc.

Marzola, Sean Thomas

Retirement Housing Foundation

Platinum Roofing, Inc.

 

Court Documents

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Pacific Coast Supply, LLC. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

Answer

Plymouth Place, Inc.'s Answer to Complaint for Breach of Contract, For Reasonable Value of Work Performed, for Open Book Account, and to Foreclose on a Mechanics' Lien-------------First paper Limited Civil (amount over $10,000 up to $25,000) filed by Plymouth Place Inc., Retirement Housing Foundation. Action Type: First paper Limited Civil (amount over $10,000 up to $25,000); Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Plymouth Place Inc., Retirement Housing Foundation served on 11/13/2019 by Personal Service. $85.00. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Sean Thomas Marzola served on 11/19/2019 by Personal Service. $170.00. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

Cross-Complaint

Plymouth Place, Inc.'s Cross-Complaint against Platinum Roofing, Inc. for Implied Indemnity, Statutory Contribution, Negligent Interference with Prospective Economic Advantage, and Intentional Interference with Prospective Economic Advantage filed by Plymouth Place, Inc. Action Type: Cross-Complaint; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

Complaint

Complaint Limited ($10,000 up to $25,000) filed by Pacific Coast Supply, LLC. Action Type: Complaint Limited ($10,000 up to $25,000); Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Platinum Roofing, Inc. served on 11/14/2019 by Personal Service. $50.00. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

Notice to Filing Party

12/20/2019: Notice to Filing Party

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Plymouth Place, Inc.'s Answer to Complaint for Breach of Contract, For Reasonable Value of Work Performed, for Open Book Account, and to Foreclose on a Mechanics' Lien-------------First paper Limited Civil (amount over $10,000 up to $25,000) filed by Plymouth Place Inc., Retirement Housing Foundation. Action Type: First paper Limited Civil (amount over $10,000 up to $25,000); Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • Payment received by Retirement Plymouth Place Inc. in the amount of $370.00. Receipt number 514764. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • Attorney, David P. E. Burkett, retained for Plymouth Place, Inc . Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • Attorney, David P. E. Burkett, retained for Plymouth Place Inc., Retirement Housing Foundation . Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Plymouth Place, Inc.'s Cross-Complaint against Platinum Roofing, Inc. for Implied Indemnity, Statutory Contribution, Negligent Interference with Prospective Economic Advantage, and Intentional Interference with Prospective Economic Advantage filed by Plymouth Place, Inc. Action Type: Cross-Complaint; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to Platinum Roofing, Inc. served on 11/14/2019 by Personal Service. $50.00. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to Sean Thomas Marzola served on 11/19/2019 by Personal Service. $170.00. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to Plymouth Place Inc., Retirement Housing Foundation served on 11/13/2019 by Personal Service. $85.00. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 03/13/2020 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Michael Mulvihill in Department 10C. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Pacific Coast Supply, LLC. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Limited ($10,000 up to $25,000) filed by Pacific Coast Supply, LLC. Action Type: Complaint Limited ($10,000 up to $25,000); Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • Payment received by LLC Pacific Coast Supply in the amount of $370.00. Receipt number 474547. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • Case initiated. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.