This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/30/2018 at 06:24:31 (UTC).

Oseguera vs. Union Pacific Railroad Company

Case Summary

On 01/25/2012 Oseguera filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Union Pacific Railroad Company. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The case status is Other - Stayed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************1021

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2012

  • Case Status:

    Other - Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Miscellaneous Participant 1,

Oseguera, Victoria

Oseguera, Jose

Miscellaneous Participant 101

Miscellaneous Participant 100

Miscellaneous Participant 3,

Defendants

Beck, Brandon

Pearson, Malcolm

Sanchez, Ryan

Lackey, T.J.

Sanchez, Nannette

Larson, Rhonda

Smith, Karen

Smith, Christopher

Union Pacific Railroad Company, A De Corporation

Sanchez, Roger

Larsen, Christopher

Intervenors

American Security Insurance Company

Miscellaneous Participant,

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

05/03/2013: Minute Order

Payment Receipt

07/20/2012: Payment Receipt

Minute Order

08/29/2012: Minute Order

Tentative Rulings

08/28/2012: Tentative Rulings

Minute Order

08/16/2012: Minute Order

Minute Order

12/10/2012: Minute Order

Tentative Rulings

05/02/2013: Tentative Rulings

Tentative Rulings

07/26/2012: Tentative Rulings

Tentative Rulings

07/02/2013: Tentative Rulings

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2015
  • DocketCase reassigned to Holly,Carter effective 01/30/2015. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2013
  • DocketManual Notice of Settlement expired. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2013
  • DocketCase note created on 08/07/2013. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2013
  • DocketMotion for Summary Judgment - Deft Union Pacific Railroads Motion for summary judgment/summary adjudication against Plaintiffs Jose and Victoria Oseguera scheduled for 09/24/2013 at 09:00:00 AM in 42 was vacated. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2013
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal - Filing associated on 08/06/2013. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2013
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal filed by Oseguera, Jose; Oseguera, Victoria on 08/05/2013. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2013
  • DocketStatus of Victoria Oseguera updated to Dismissed with Prejudice. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2013
  • DocketStatus of Jose Oseguera updated to Dismissed with Prejudice. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2013
  • DocketStatus of American Security Insurance Company updated to Dismissed with Prejudice. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2013
  • DocketStatus of Union Pacific Railroad Company, a DE Corporation updated to Dismissed with Prejudice. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
844 More Docket Entries
  • 01/25/2012
  • DocketCase initiation completed. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2012
  • DocketAutomatic Event Scheduled - Not Heard Clock started. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2012
  • DocketAutomatic Unlimited Case Disposition Clock started. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2012
  • DocketVolume 1 created and added to case file with an ROA Start Date of 01/25/2012. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2012
  • DocketPayment received for 166 - Complaint or other 1st paper in the amount of 395.00 on 01/25/2012, transaction number 928433 and receipt number 247619. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2012
  • DocketCase Management Conference - scheduled for 06/25/2012 at 08:45:00 AM in 42 at Stockton Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2012
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer McNatt, Bob. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2012
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Oseguera, Jose; Oseguera, Victoria on 01/25/2012. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2012
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Oseguera, Jose; Oseguera, Victoria on 01/25/2012. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2012
  • DocketComplaint filed by Oseguera, Jose; Oseguera, Victoria on 01/25/2012. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where American Security Ins Co is a litigant

Latest cases where Union Pacific Railroad Company is a litigant