This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 12/05/2019 02:42:53

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 11/18/2019 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Oportun Inc against Peter Kaleb Evelyn in the jurisdiction of San Joaquin County Superior Courts , Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number ******************5377
  • Filing Date 11/18/2019
  • Case Status Pending - Other Pending
  • Case Type Small Claim - Other Small Claim
  • Jurisdiction San Joaquin County Superior Courts
  • Judge Guy Castillo, Erin
  • Courthouse Stockton Courthouse
  • County San Joaquin
  • State California

Party Details

  • Defendant Evelyn, Peter Kaleb
  • Plaintiff Oportun Inc.

Court Documents

SC104 Proof of Service (Small Claims)

Proof of Service (SC) as to Peter Kaleb Evelyn served on 11/...

Free with Subscription
SC100 Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Cour...

Plaintiff's Claim greater than 12 within previous 12 months ...

Free with Subscription

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2019
  • Proof of Service (SC) as to Peter Kaleb Evelyn served on 11/22/2019 by Substituted Service. $50.00. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.
  • 11/18/2019
  • Hearing regarding: Court Trial Principal 702.11 Adj Cost 30.00, set for 03/11/2020 at 1:30 PM before Hon. Erin Guy Castillo in Department 3A. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.
  • 11/18/2019
  • Plaintiff's Claim greater than 12 within previous 12 months filed by Oportun Inc.. Action Type: Plaintiff's Claim greater than 12 within previous 12 months; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.
  • 11/18/2019
  • Payment received by Oportun Inc. in the amount of $100.00. Receipt number 500795. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.
  • 11/18/2019
  • Case initiated. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.