This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/08/2020 at 14:25:07 (UTC).

Oportun Inc. vs Jesus Eduardo Avila Cardenas

Case Summary

On 11/18/2019 Oportun Inc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Jesus Eduardo Avila Cardenas. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Guy Castillo, Erin. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******************5359

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Guy Castillo, Erin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Oportun Inc.

Defendant

Cardenas, Jesus Eduardo Avila

 

Court Documents

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Small Claims Judgment entered and filed. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Court Trial held on 03/11/2020 01:30 PM . Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

SC104 Proof of Service (Small Claims)

Proof of Service (SC) as to Jesus Eduardo Avila Cardenas served on 12/06/2019 by Personal Service. $50.00. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

SC100 Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Plaintiff's Claim greater than 12 within previous 12 months filed by Oportun Inc.. Action Type: Plaintiff's Claim greater than 12 within previous 12 months; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2020
  • HearingHearing Type: Court Trial; Court Room: 3A; Result: Held; Judge: Erin Guy Castillo; Participant: Jesus Eduardo Avila Cardenas (Defendant); Participant: Oportun Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketCase status updated to Disposed. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Court Trial held on 03/11/2020 01:30 PM . Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketHearing re: Court Trial held on March 11, 2020. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Judgment entered and filed. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service (SC) as to Jesus Eduardo Avila Cardenas served on 12/06/2019 by Personal Service. $50.00. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketHearing regarding: Court Trial Principal 421.46 Adj Cost 30.00, set for 03/11/2020 at 1:30 PM before Hon. Erin Guy Castillo in Department 3A. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim greater than 12 within previous 12 months filed by Oportun Inc.. Action Type: Plaintiff's Claim greater than 12 within previous 12 months; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketPayment received by Oportun Inc. in the amount of $100.00. Receipt number 500722. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketCase initiated. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.