This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 04/14/2020 at 02:26:15 (UTC).

Oportun Inc. vs Armando Hernandez Garcia

Case Summary

On 09/18/2019 Oportun Inc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Armando Hernandez Garcia. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Guy Castillo, Erin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******************2250

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Guy Castillo, Erin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Oportun Inc.

Defendant

Garcia, Armando Hernandez

 

Court Documents

SC109 Authorization to Appear

Authorization to Appear filed by Oportun Inc.. Action Type: Authorization to Appear; Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Court Trial held on 12/12/2019 01:30 PM . Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

SC104 Proof of Service (Small Claims)

Proof of Service (SC) as to Armando Hernandez Garcia served on 10/03/2019 by Personal Service. $50.00. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

SC100 Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Plaintiff's Claim greater than 12 within previous 12 months filed by Oportun Inc.. Action Type: Plaintiff's Claim greater than 12 within previous 12 months; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2020
  • HearingHearing Type: Court Trial; Court Room: 3B; Judge: Jayne Lee; Participant: Oportun Inc. (Plaintiff); Participant: Armando Hernandez Garcia (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • DocketHearing Result: Reassigned Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • HearingHearing Type: Court Trial; Court Room: 3B; Result: Continued - Parties Motion; Judge: Jayne Lee; Participant: Oportun Inc. (Plaintiff); Participant: Armando Hernandez Garcia (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketHearing regarding: Court Trial Principal: 1567.67 Adj Costs: 100.00, set for 04/07/2020 at 1:30 PM before Hon. Jayne Lee in Department 3B. Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear filed by Oportun Inc.. Action Type: Authorization to Appear; Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Court Trial held on 12/12/2019 01:30 PM . Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketHearing Result: Continued - Parties Motion Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service (SC) as to Armando Hernandez Garcia served on 10/03/2019 by Personal Service. $50.00. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • DocketHearing regarding: Court Trial Principal: 1567.67 Adj Costs: 50.00, set for 12/12/2019 at 1:30 PM before Hon. Jayne Lee in Department 3B. Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim greater than 12 within previous 12 months filed by Oportun Inc.. Action Type: Plaintiff's Claim greater than 12 within previous 12 months; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • DocketPayment received by Oportun Inc. in the amount of $100.00. Receipt number 473944. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • DocketCase initiated. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.