This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 12/05/2019 at 02:43:12 (UTC).

Oportun Inc. vs Angelica Martha Contreras

Case Summary

On 11/18/2019 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Oportun Inc against Angelica Martha Contreras in the jurisdiction of San Joaquin County Superior Courts , Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******************5357

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Guy Castillo, Erin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Oportun Inc.

Defendant

Contreras, Angelica Martha

 

Court Documents

SC100 Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Plaintiff's Claim greater than 12 within previous 12 months filed by Oportun Inc.. Action Type: Plaintiff's Claim greater than 12 within previous 12 months; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

SC104 Proof of Service (Small Claims)

Proof of Service (SC) as to Angelica Martha Contreras served on 11/24/2019 by . . duplicate filing Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

SC104 Proof of Service (Small Claims)

Proof of Service (SC) as to Angelica Martha Contreras served on 11/24/2019 by Personal Service. $50.00. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service (SC) as to Angelica Martha Contreras served on 11/24/2019 by . . duplicate filing Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service (SC) as to Angelica Martha Contreras served on 11/24/2019 by Personal Service. $50.00. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketHearing regarding: Court Trial Principal 659.35 Adj Cost 30.00, set for 03/09/2020 at 1:30 PM before Hon. Erin Guy Castillo in Department 3A. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim greater than 12 within previous 12 months filed by Oportun Inc.. Action Type: Plaintiff's Claim greater than 12 within previous 12 months; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketPayment received by Oportun Inc. in the amount of $100.00. Receipt number 500717. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketCase initiated. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.