This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 08/03/2018 at 05:27:17 (UTC).

Opai J Allen vs. American Medical Response Inc

Case Summary

On 09/21/2011 Opai J Allen filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against American Medical Response Inc. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is McNatt, Bob. The case status is Pending - Appeal.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************3263

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2011

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Appeal

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

McNatt, Bob

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Allen, Opai J

Miscellaneous Participant 1,

Miscellaneous Participant 3,

Allen, Victor Sr

Miscellaneous Participant,

Defendants and Plaintiffs

Miscellaneous Participant 1,

American Medical Response Inc

County Of San Joaquin

Buys M.D., Richard N

Pollock, Nurse

Roberts, Jared

Demartinez M.D., Douglas

Moore, Joshua

Bolt, Robert

Miscellaneous Participant 3,

American Medical Response West Herein Sued As American Medical Response, Inc And American Medical Response Ambulance Service, Inc.

Burch, Dan

American Medical Response Ambulance Service Inc.

Miscellaneous Participant,

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

04/02/2013: Minute Order

Minute Order

11/05/2012: Minute Order

Payment Receipt - Void

04/26/2013: Payment Receipt - Void

Correspondence - Received

02/18/2016: Correspondence - Received

Minute Order

05/19/2014: Minute Order

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process)

05/19/2014: Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process)

Payment Receipt

07/25/2014: Payment Receipt

Tentative Rulings

07/05/2012: Tentative Rulings

Tentative Rulings

05/29/2013: Tentative Rulings

46 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Remittitur filed. The judgment is affirmed. Action Type: Remittitur filed.; Judge: McNatt, Bob.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2015
  • Payment received for 44A - Copy of any record (per side) in the amount of 19.00 on 05/15/2015, transaction number 1502191 and receipt number 398863. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2015
  • location changed from Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Other to Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Rm 5 Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2015
  • location changed from Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Appeals to Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Rm 5 Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2015
  • location changed from Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Appeals to Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Rm 5 Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2015
  • location changed from Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Appeals to Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Rm 5 Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2015
  • Proof of Service - MAILING (Declaration of Lisa Grayson mailed to Court of Appeal, Attorney Mitchell and Attorney Marsh) filed by The Superior Court of San Joaquin on 03/03/2015. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2014
  • Status of Victor Allen updated to Active/Represented. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2014
  • Status of Opal Allen updated to Active/Represented. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2014
  • Declaration - Other (to all parties) associated on 12/29/2014. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
535 More Docket Entries
  • 09/22/2011
  • Automatic Proof of Service Clock started. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2011
  • Payment received for 44A - Copy of any record (per side) in the amount of 4.50 on 09/22/2011, transaction number 867645 and receipt number 231746. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2011
  • Case initiation form printed. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2011
  • Case location updated to Stockton on 09/22/2011. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2011
  • Summons issued. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2011
  • Case Management Conference - scheduled for 02/22/2012 at 08:45:00 AM in 42 at Stockton Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2011
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Holly, Carter. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2011
  • Original Summons filed by Allen, Opai J; Allen, Victor Sr on 09/21/2011. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2011
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Allen, Opai J; Allen, Victor Sr on 09/21/2011. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2011
  • Complaint filed by Allen, Opai J; Allen, Victor Sr on 09/21/2011. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where American Medical Response West is a litigant

Latest cases where American Medical Response Ambulance Service, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERICAN MEDICAL RESPONSE INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant