This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 08/02/2018 at 23:42:03 (UTC).

Oakland Strokes, Inc. vs. Chapman Motors L.L.C.

Case Summary

On 07/08/2011 Oakland Strokes, Inc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Chapman Motors L L C. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Lodi Branch Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Urie, Phillip. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******************9728

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Urie, Phillip

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Oakland Strokes, Inc.

Defendants

Chapman Motors L.L.C.

Chapman, Janice

 

Court Documents

SC104 Proof of Service (Small Claims)

07/19/2011: SC104 Proof of Service (Small Claims)

Decision

09/01/2011: Decision

Minute Order

09/01/2011: Minute Order

Payment Receipt

12/02/2011: Payment Receipt

EJ130 Writ of Execution

03/10/2015: EJ130 Writ of Execution

Minute Order

08/17/2011: Minute Order

Minute Order

07/02/2012: Minute Order

SC104 Proof of Service (Small Claims)

07/19/2011: SC104 Proof of Service (Small Claims)

SC100 Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

07/08/2011: SC100 Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/28/2015
  • DocketWrit has been updated. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2015
  • DocketWrit of Execution Returned (writ is partially satisfied) filed by Oakland Strokes, Inc. on 03/10/2015. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2015
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court (partially satisfied) associated on 03/06/2015. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2015
  • DocketWrit has been updated. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2015
  • DocketWrit of Execution Returned (partially satisfied) filed by Oakland Strokes, Inc. on 03/06/2015. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • DocketCase note created on 12/16/2013. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2013
  • Docketlocation changed from Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Rm 303 to Offsite,Records Management,Other Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2012
  • Docketlocation changed from Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Small Claims to Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Rm 303 Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2012
  • DocketVolume updated. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2012
  • DocketMatter heard. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
63 More Docket Entries
  • 07/11/2011
  • DocketPayment received for 03 - Claim $1,500 or less in the amount of 30.00 on 07/11/2011, transaction number 823749 and receipt number 220807. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2011
  • DocketAddress for Janice Chapman selected. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2011
  • DocketAddress for Oakland Strokes, Inc. selected. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2011
  • DocketAutomatic Small Claims Disposition Clock started. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2011
  • DocketCase initiation form printed. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2011
  • DocketCase initiation completed. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2011
  • DocketAutomatic Event Scheduled - Not Heard Clock started. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2011
  • DocketCourt Trial (SC) - Pltfs claim 874.04 cost 30.00No auth to appear filed by pltf or deft scheduled for 08/17/2011 at 08:15:00 AM in L2 at Lodi. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2011
  • DocketCase assigned to Department L2. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2011
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court filed by Oakland Strokes, Inc. on 07/08/2011. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less