This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 08/20/2018 at 10:44:57 (UTC).

Norma Naranjo Manzo vs Hugo Manzo 2000000001846143

Case Summary

On 02/24/2016 Norma Naranjo Manzo filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Hugo Manzo 2000000001846143. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts , Stockton Family Law Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Appel, Robin and Agbayani, Tony J.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************0904

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Family Law Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judges

Appel, Robin

Agbayani, Tony J.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Manzo, Norma Naranjo

Respondent

Manzo, Hugo

Not Classified By Court

Braten - 2016, Earl

Interested Party

County Of San Joaquin

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2018
  • Hearing regarding: Notice of Motion (Governmental)-Mod LCSA NOM MOD regarding child support, health care and payment on arrears, set for 08/28/2018 at 1:30 PM before Hon. Cheryl A. McCann in Department 5A. Judge: McCann, Cheryl A..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Notice of Motion(Governmental) Mod filed by County Of San Joaquin. Action Type: Notice of Motion(Governmental) Mod; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • Payment received in the amount of $29.50, receipt number 238853. Judge: Agbayani, Tony J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • Payment received in the amount of $27.50, receipt number 177122. Judge: Agbayani, Tony J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • Ex Parte Application for Restoration of Former Name After Entry of Judgment and Order filed. Judge: Agbayani, Tony J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • Case associated with case: , STA-FL-DVW-2015-0002854 Judge: Agbayani, Tony J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment filed. Judge: Agbayani, Tony J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • Family Law Judgment entered and filed. Judge: Agbayani, Tony J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2017
  • Order After Hearing filed by Norma Naranjo Manzo, Hugo Manzo. Judge: Agbayani, Tony J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2017
  • Order After Hearing of 10/11/2016 and 11/9/2016 filed. Judge: Agbayani, Tony J..

    Read MoreRead Less
43 More Docket Entries
  • 04/04/2016
  • Declaration Under Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction and Enforcement (UUCJEA) filed by Manzo, Hugo. Action Type: Declaration Under Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction and Enforcement (UUCJEA); Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2016
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to Hugo Manzo filed. Served on 03/05/2016. Method of Service: Personal Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Summons issued and filed. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Income and Expense Declaration filed by Manzo, Norma Naranjo. Action Type: Income and Expense Declaration; Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Community and Quasi Community Property Declaration filed by Manzo, Norma Naranjo. Action Type: Community and Quasi Community Property Declaration; Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Payment received by in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 34290. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Separate Property Declaration filed by Manzo, Norma Naranjo. Action Type: Separate Property Declaration; Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Petition for Dissolution of Marriage filed by Manzo, Norma Naranjo. Action Type: Petition for Dissolution of Marriage; Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Declaration Under Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction and Enforcement Act filed by . Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less