This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/21/2018 at 01:15:38 (UTC).

Nora Alvarez vs Austin Tomlinson et al.

Case Summary

On 11/02/2015 Nora Alvarez filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Austin Tomlinson. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Manteca Branch Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Mulvihill, Michael. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************0226

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Mulvihill, Michael

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Alvarez, Nora

Defendants

Tomlinson, Austin

Galan, Kyle

 

Court Documents

NoticethatYouHaveBeenSued.rtf

Notice That You Have Been Sued. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

SUM130 Summons - Unlawful Detainer

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Unlawful Detainer; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Alvarez, Nora. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

Complaint

Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000) filed by Alvarez, Nora. Action Type: Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment filed by Alvarez, Nora. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

Application for Writ of Possession

Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010 filed by Alvarez, Nora. Action Type: Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Austin Tomlinson served on 02/09/2016. Type of Service Personal. $60.00. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Kyle Galan served on 02/09/2016. Type of Service Personal. $60.00. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

UD110 Judgment- Unlawful Detainer

Clerk's Default Judgment for Possession for Nora Alvarez against Austin Tomlinson, Kyle Galan filed and entered . Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

Writ Return

Writ of Possession as to Kyle Galan and Austin Tomlinson, Writ Returned Satisfied with $145.00 Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Possession as to Kyle Galan and Austin Tomlinson, Writ Returned Satisfied with $145.00 Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2016
  • DocketCase status updated to Disposed. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2016
  • DocketPayment received by in the amount of $25.00. Receipt number 32357. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Default Judgment for Possession for Nora Alvarez against Austin Tomlinson, Kyle Galan filed and entered . Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2016
  • DocketWrit of Possession issued as to Kyle Galan on 02/18/2016 to San Joaquin County. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2016
  • DocketWrit of Possession issued as to Austin Tomlinson on 02/18/2016 to San Joaquin County. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2016
  • DocketRequest for Default against Austin Tomlinson, Kyle Galan Entered Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Default Judgment filed by Alvarez, Nora. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010 filed by Alvarez, Nora. Action Type: Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Austin Tomlinson served on 02/09/2016. Type of Service Personal. $60.00. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Kyle Galan served on 02/09/2016. Type of Service Personal. $60.00. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2015
  • DocketNotice that you have been sued sent to Austin Tomlinson returned by USPS. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Unlawful Detainer; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2015
  • DocketPayment received by in the amount of $240.00. Receipt number 4233. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000) filed by Alvarez, Nora. Action Type: Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Alvarez, Nora. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice That You Have Been Sued. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2015
  • DocketCase initiated. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less