This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/27/2019 at 11:41:01 (UTC).

Nora Aguilar vs. Mossdale 203, LLC

Case Summary

On 08/05/2014 Nora Aguilar filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against Mossdale 203, LLC. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Lofthus, Linda L. and Scott, W. Stephen. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************7783

  • Filing Date:

    08/05/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judges

Lofthus, Linda L.

Scott, W. Stephen

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Acolaste, Ann

Aguilar, Nora

Ahljova, Ava

August, Werner

Carbonell, Isabel

Devoe, Marques

Garcia, Juan

Gonzalez, Amalia

Hernandez, Olga

Mahler, Daniel

Moghrabi, Ghasoub

Mould, Kevin

Nisperos, Thomas

Pagdanganan, Alma

Reyes, Salvador

Rios, Robert

Romo, Erika

Santos, Benjamin

Simmons, Michael

Smith, Sandra

112 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Whitaker, Michael

Whitaker, Michael Thomas

Other Attorneys

Arabi, Arash S.

Schaffer, Todd Allen

Park, David S.

Moak, Stacy M.

Brilliant, Rachel K.

Garske, Christine E

Hazelton, Troy M.

Walsh, Paul Bradley

Han, James Sang-Hun

Porter, James A.

Aliotti, Melissa Blair

Lowe, Amanda R

Panchal, Jitesh G.

Wood, Ted D

 

Court Documents

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by House Construction. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Petersen-Dean, Inc.. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

Defendant Petersen-Dean Inc.'s Opposition to plaintiffs Nora Aguilar, Et Al.'s Motion to Enforce Judgment Pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure Section 664.7

Defendant Petersen-Dean Inc.'s Opposition to plaintiffs Nora Aguilar, Et Al.'s Motion to Enforce Judgment Pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure Section 664.7 filed by Petersen-Dean, Inc.. Action Type: Opposition; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

Notice of Change of Handling Attorney

Notice of Change of Handling Attorney filed by Mcbay Tile, Inc.. Action Type: Notice - (Other); Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

Order to Show Cause (CCP 177.5)

Hearing regarding: Court's OSC Re: Sanctions for failure to appear on 4/20/18 at Case Management Conference and for failure to file a Request for Dismissal as to the Complaint-In -Intervention filed by Intervenor, Stillwater Insurance for a Vintage Garage Door Co., Inc, a suspended corporation; CCP section 177.5, set for 05/31/2018 at 8:30 AM before Hon. W. Stephen Scott in Department 10A. Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement

Application of Cross-Defendant, Ike's Landscaping, Inc. (Roe No. 5) for Determination of Good Faith Settlement filed by Ike's Landscape, Inc.. Action Type: Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

Payment Receipt

07/15/2015: Payment Receipt

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 04/20/2018 08:30 AM . Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

Special Answer

Special Answer to Complaint filed by Republic Electric West, Inc. dba Nevada Republic Electric West, Inc.. Action Type: Answer; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

103 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2019
  • Case status updated to Closed. Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Response filed by Stillwater-Insurance Intervenor, For A Vintage Garage Door Co., Inc. a suspended corporation. Action Type: Response; Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • Payment received in the amount of $42.00, receipt number 294013. Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • Hearing Result: Vacated Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • Case status updated to Disposed. Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • Request for Dismissal filed by Stillwater-Insurance Intervenor, For A Vintage Garage Door Co., Inc. a suspended corporation. Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal - Entire Action as to For A Vintage Garage Door Co., Inc. a suspended corporation Stillwater-Insurance Intervenor Entered. Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • Hearing re: Case Management Conference held on April 20, 2018. Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 04/20/2018 08:30 AM . Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Hearing regarding: Court's OSC Re: Sanctions for failure to appear on 4/20/18 at Case Management Conference and for failure to file a Request for Dismissal as to the Complaint-In -Intervention filed by Intervenor, Stillwater Insurance for a Vintage Garage Door Co., Inc, a suspended corporation; CCP section 177.5, set for 05/31/2018 at 8:30 AM before Hon. W. Stephen Scott in Department 10A. Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

    Read MoreRead Less
500 More Docket Entries
  • 08/05/2014
  • Address for Michael Whitaker selected. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2014
  • Cause of Action number 5 added. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2014
  • Case initiation form printed. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2014
  • Case initiation completed. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2014
  • Automatic Failure to File Default Clock started. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2014
  • Case Management Conference - scheduled for 01/02/2015 at 08:30:00 AM in 33 at Stockton Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2014
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Lofthus, Linda. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2014
  • Original Summons filed by Aguilar, Nora on 08/05/2014. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2014
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Aguilar, Nora on 08/05/2014. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2014
  • Complaint filed by Aguilar, Nora on 08/05/2014. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hazelton, Troy M.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Garske, Christine E

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRILLIANT, RACHEL K

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PORTER, JAMES A