This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 02/04/2023 at 10:30:05 (UTC).

Nicole Avone Burton vs Claudia L. Aceves

Case Summary

On 09/28/2022 Nicole Avone Burton filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against Claudia L Aceves. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Manteca Branch Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Agbayani, Tony J.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************8663

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Agbayani, Tony J.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Burton, Nicole Avone

Respondent

Aceves, Claudia L.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

Moore, Michael K.

 

Court Documents

CivilRestrainingOrderNoticetoFilingParty.rtf

Civil Restraining Order Notice to Filing Party.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Burton, Nicole Avone.

CH100 Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders

Request for Orders to Stop Harassment with Violence (Civil Harassment) filed by Burton, Nicole Avone.

CH109 Notice of Court Hearing (Civil Harassment Prevention)

Notice of Court Hearing - TRO filed by Nicole Avone Burton.

CH110 MP Temporary Restraining Order

Temporary Restraining Order Granted and filed on 09/28/2022.

CH200 MP Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Sheriff (Fee Waived) as to Claudia L. Aceves served on 10/07/2022 by Personal Service. $0.00.

Minute_Order.rtf

Minutes finalized for OSC Re: Harassment held on 10/26/2022 10:30 AM .

CH116 MP Notice of New Hearing Date and Order on Reissuance

Order on Request to Continue Hearing filed by Nicole Avone Burton, Claudia L. Aceves.

Minute_Order.rtf

Minutes finalized for OSC Re: Harassment held on 12/09/2022 10:30 AM .

CH116 MP Notice of New Hearing Date and Order on Reissuance

The Court Orders the Notice of New Hearing and Order on Reissuance Granted on 12/09/2022. See Order filed herein.

Minute_Order.rtf

Minutes finalized for Ruling on Submitted Matter held on 12/16/2022 04:30 PM .

Order After Hearing

Order After Hearing/Court Finding filed.

Clerk's Certificate of Service by Mail

Order After Hearing/Court Finding filed.

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketCase status updated to Disposed.; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • HearingHearing Type: Ruling on Submitted Matter; Court Room: M2; Result: Held; Judge: Tony J. Agbayani; Participants; Claudia L. Aceves (Respondent); Nicole Avone Burton (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Ruling on Submitted Matter held on 12/16/2022 04:30 PM .; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder After Hearing/Court Finding filed.; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketHearing re: Ruling on Submitted Matter held on December 16, 2022.; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • HearingHearing Type: OSC Re: Harassment; Court Room: M2; Result: Continued-Court's Motion; Judge: Tony J. Agbayani; Participants; Claudia L. Aceves (Respondent); Nicole Avone Burton (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketHearing regarding: Ruling on Submitted Matter Tracking Purposes, set for 12/16/2022 at 10:30 AM before Hon. Tony J. Agbayani in Department M2.; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for OSC Re: Harassment held on 12/09/2022 10:30 AM .; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketThe Court Orders the Notice of New Hearing and Order on Reissuance Granted on 12/09/2022. See Order filed herein.; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketOSC Re: Harassment to be heard at 10:00 AM scheduled on 12/09/2022 at 10:30 AM has been Continued.; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 10/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder on Request to Continue Hearing filed by Nicole Avone Burton, Claudia L. Aceves.; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketHearing Result: Continued - Parties Motion; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by Sheriff (Fee Waived) as to Claudia L. Aceves served on 10/07/2022 by Personal Service. $0.00.; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketHearing regarding: OSC Re: Harassment , set for 10/26/2022 at 10:30 AM before Hon. Tony J. Agbayani in Department M2.; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order Granted and filed on 09/28/2022.; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Court Hearing - TRO filed by Nicole Avone Burton.; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Restraining Order Notice to Filing Party.; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketCase initiated.; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Orders to Stop Harassment with Violence (Civil Harassment) filed by Burton, Nicole Avone.; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Burton, Nicole Avone.; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less