This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 08/02/2018 at 11:06:14 (UTC).

Neives vs. Mckelvey

Case Summary

On 02/17/2011 Neives filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Mckelvey. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Sparks, Sheryle. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******************2569

  • Filing Date:

    02/17/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Sparks, Sheryle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Neives, Margarito Vivamontes

Defendant

Mckevley, Junius

 

Court Documents

Payment Receipt

02/17/2011: Payment Receipt

SC100 Plaintiff Claim and Order to Defendant

02/17/2011: SC100 Plaintiff Claim and Order to Defendant

SC100 Plaintiff Claim and Order to Defendant

02/17/2011: SC100 Plaintiff Claim and Order to Defendant

SC100 Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

02/17/2011: SC100 Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Certified Mail Receipt

02/24/2011: Certified Mail Receipt

Small Claims Subpoena

03/23/2011: Small Claims Subpoena

Small Claims Subpoena

03/23/2011: Small Claims Subpoena

Small Claims Subpoens

03/23/2011: Small Claims Subpoens

Proof of Service

03/24/2011: Proof of Service

SC130 Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

03/26/2011: SC130 Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Minute Order

03/30/2011: Minute Order

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

04/07/2011: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Notice of Entry of Judgment

08/10/2011: Notice of Entry of Judgment

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/29/2013
  • Docketlocation changed from Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Rm 303 to Offsite,Records Management Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2011
  • DocketThe status of Award1 has been updated to Fully Satisfied. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2011
  • DocketSatisfaction of Judgment - Acknowledgment of filed by Neives, Margarito Vivamontes on 08/10/2011. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2011
  • DocketCase status updated to Post Judgment effective 05/07/2011 Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2011
  • DocketMilestone of Disposition 95 days met timely. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2011
  • DocketMilestone of Disposition 75 days met timely. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2011
  • DocketAutomatic Small Claims Disposition Clock stopped. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2011
  • DocketStatus of Margarito Neives updated to Disposed. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2011
  • DocketStatus of Junius Mckelvey updated to Disposed. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2011
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court disposed with disposition of Judgment uncontested. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 02/17/2011
  • DocketCase title updated to Neives vs. Mckelvey effective 02/17/2011. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2011
  • DocketName of Mckelvey,Junius updated. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2011
  • DocketMckelvey,Junius selected to be used on case. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2011
  • Docketlocation changed from Courthouse to Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Small Claims Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2011
  • DocketSan Joaquin Case Label generated. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2011
  • DocketSC100 Plaintiff Claim and Order to Defendant generated. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2011
  • DocketCourt Trial (SC) - 6191.01 principal, plus 85.00 costs scheduled for 03/30/2011 at 09:30:00 AM in B1 at Stockton. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2011
  • DocketCase assigned to Department B1. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2011
  • DocketCertified Mail Receipt filed by Neives, Margarito Vivamontes on 02/17/2011. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2011
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court filed by Neives, Margarito Vivamontes on 02/17/2011. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less