This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 07:40:53 (UTC).

Nationwide Insurance Company of America vs Humberto Sanchez

Case Summary

On 02/23/2016 Nationwide Insurance Company of America filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Humberto Sanchez. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts , Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Holly, Carter. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************1842

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Holly, Carter

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Nationwide Insurance Company of America

Defendant

Sanchez, Humberto

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Deal, Michael R.

 

Court Documents

Declaration

Declaration of Edward Smith filed by Nationwide Insurance Company of America. Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Holly, Carter.

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

02/23/2016: Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Declaration

Declaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585 filed by Nationwide Insurance Company of America. Action Type: Declaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585; Judge: Holly, Carter.

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Holly, Carter.

Statement of Damages

Statement of Damages filed by Nationwide Insurance Company of America. Action Type: Statement of Damages; Judge: Holly, Carter.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service of Summons as to Humberto Sanchez served on 03/16/2016. Type of Service Personal. $75.00. Judge: Holly, Carter.

Entry of Default

Request for Entry of Default and Court Judgment filed by Nationwide Insurance Company of America. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment; Judge: Holly, Carter.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Holly, Carter.

Complaint

Complaint Limited (amount up to $10,000) filed by Nationwide Insurance Company of America. Action Type: Complaint Limited (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Holly, Carter.

Request for Dismissal of Does

Request for Dismissal Does filed by Nationwide Insurance Company of America. Action Type: Request for Dismissal Does; Judge: Holly, Carter.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Nationwide Insurance Company of America. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Holly, Carter.

Declaration

Declaration in Support of Business Records filed by Nationwide Insurance Company of America. Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Holly, Carter.

Notice of Entry of Judgment

Notice of Entry of Judgment filed by Nationwide Insurance Company of America. Action Type: Notice of Entry of Judgment; Judge: Holly, Carter.

EJ100 Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

Acknowledgment of FULL Satisfaction of Judgment filed by Nationwide Insurance Company of America. Action Type: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Judge: Holly, Carter.

Judgment

Judgment for Nationwide Insurance Company of America against Humberto Sanchez in the amount of $1876.96. Judge: Holly, Carter.

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Acknowledgment of FULL Satisfaction of Judgment filed by Nationwide Insurance Company of America. Action Type: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2016
  • Abstract of Judgment Issued. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2016
  • Payment received by Nationwide Insurance Company of America in the amount of $25.00. Receipt number 117886. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2016
  • DL-30 Issued. Action Type: Certificate of facts regarding unsatisfied judgment (DL30); Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2016
  • Withholding revoked Action Type: Certificate of facts regarding unsatisfied judgment (DL30); Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2016
  • Payment received by Nationwide Insurance Company of America in the amount of $15.00. Receipt number 115944. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2016
  • Payment received by Nationwide Insurance Company of America in the amount of $15.00. Receipt number 115925. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2016
  • DL-30 Issued. Action Type: Certificate of facts regarding unsatisfied judgment (DL30); Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2016
  • Withholding revoked Action Type: Certificate of facts regarding unsatisfied judgment (DL30); Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2016
  • Payment received by RH Services in the amount of $25.00. Receipt number 87830. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 04/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration of Edward Smith filed by Nationwide Insurance Company of America. Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration in Support of Business Records filed by Nationwide Insurance Company of America. Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 08/19/2016 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Carter Holly in Department 41. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Limited (amount up to $10,000) filed by Nationwide Insurance Company of America. Action Type: Complaint Limited (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Nationwide Insurance Company of America. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Payment received by in the amount of $225.00. Receipt number 33999. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Attorney, Michael R. Deal, retained for Nationwide Insurance Company of America . Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less