This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 07:40:19 (UTC).

National Union Fire Insurance Company vs Anthony Oghene Oghoghorie et al.

Case Summary

On 02/23/2016 National Union Fire Insurance Company filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Anthony Oghene Oghoghorie. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts , Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Holly, Carter. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************1836

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Holly, Carter

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

National Union Fire Insurance Company

Defendants

Noja Medical Transport

Oghoghorie, Anthony Oghene

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Babbits, Dennis A. Esq.

Ferber, Brian J

 

Court Documents

JUD100 Judgment

Judgment for National Union Fire Insurance Company against Anthony Oghene Oghoghorie in the amount of 17925.65. Judge: Holly, Carter.

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal filed by National Union Fire Insurance Company. **As to Noja Medical Transport and Does 1-50** Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Holly, Carter.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Default against Anthony Oghene Oghoghorie Entered Judge: Holly, Carter.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by National Union Fire Insurance Company. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Holly, Carter.

Notice

Association of Attorneys filed by National Union Fire Insurance Company. Action Type: Notice - (Other); Judge: Holly, Carter.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Court Judgment filed by National Union Fire Insurance Company. Action Type: Request for Entry of Court Judgment; Judge: Holly, Carter.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Holly, Carter.

Notice of Hearing

Hearing regarding: CMC: Further Case Management Conference , set for 03/06/2017 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Carter Holly in Department 41. Judge: Holly, Carter.

Declaration

Declaration Pursuant to CCP 585(d) filed by National Union Fire Insurance Company. Action Type: Declaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585; Judge: Holly, Carter.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 08/01/2016 08:45 AM . Judge: Holly, Carter.

Declaration

Declaration RE: Prejudgment Interest filed by National Union Fire Insurance Company. Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Holly, Carter.

Case Summary in Support of Default Judgment

Plaintiff's Brief Case Summary filed by National Union Fire Insurance Company. Action Type: Case Summary in Support of Default Judgment; Judge: Holly, Carter.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by National Union Fire Insurance Company. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Holly, Carter.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on 03/06/2017 08:45 AM . Judge: Holly, Carter.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on 11/03/2016 08:45 AM . Judge: Holly, Carter.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Anthony Oghene Oghoghorie served on 07/28/2016 by Personal Service. $78.50. Judge: Holly, Carter.

MC050 Substitution of Attorney Civil (Without Court Order)

Substitution of Attorney filed by National Union Fire Insurance Company. Action Type: Substitution of Attorney; Judge: Holly, Carter.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by National Union Fire Insurance Company. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Holly, Carter.

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2017
  • Hearing Result: Vacated Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • Case status updated to Disposed. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment for National Union Fire Insurance Company against Anthony Oghene Oghoghorie in the amount of 17925.65. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration Pursuant to CCP 585(d) filed by National Union Fire Insurance Company. Action Type: Declaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration RE: Prejudgment Interest filed by National Union Fire Insurance Company. Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal filed by National Union Fire Insurance Company. **As to Noja Medical Transport and Does 1-50** Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Plaintiff's Brief Case Summary filed by National Union Fire Insurance Company. Action Type: Case Summary in Support of Default Judgment; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Entry of Court Judgment filed by National Union Fire Insurance Company. Action Type: Request for Entry of Court Judgment; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • Hearing regarding: CMC: Further Case Management Conference , set for 10/17/2017 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Carter Holly in Department 10B. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • Request for Dismissal - Participant entered as to Noja Medical Transport. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 07/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Association of Attorneys filed by National Union Fire Insurance Company. Action Type: Notice - (Other); Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2016
  • Attorney, Dennis A. Babbits Esq., retained for National Union Fire Insurance Company . Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 08/01/2016 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Carter Holly in Department 41. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by National Union Fire Insurance Company. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by National Union Fire Insurance Company. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Payment received by in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 33967. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Attorney, Dennis A. Babbits Esq., retained for National Union Fire Insurance Company . Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less