This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 08/15/2018 at 17:15:17 (UTC).

Natalia Elena Mejia Orellana vs Samuel Mejia

Case Summary

On 08/22/2017 Natalia Elena Mejia Orellana filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Samuel Mejia. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Family Law Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Appel, Robin. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************4656

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Family Law Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Appel, Robin

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Mejia Orellana, Natalia Elena

Respondent

Mejia, Samuel

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2018
  • Case status updated to Disposed. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment filed. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • Family Law Judgment entered and filed. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • Hearing re: Default Dissolution held on December 14, 2017. Judge: Agbayani, Tony J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • Minutes finalized for Default Dissolution held on 12/14/2017 08:45 AM . Judge: Agbayani, Tony J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • Hearing regarding: Default Dissolution Petr's Default Dissolution, set for 12/14/2017 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Tony J. Agbayani in Department 4B. Judge: Agbayani, Tony J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • Request to Set Default or Uncontested Matter for Hearing filed by Mejia Orellana, Natalia Elena. Action Type: Request to Set Default or Uncontested Matter for Hearing; Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to Samuel Mejia filed. Served on 09/25/2017. Method of Service: Personal Service Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • Declaration Regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure and Income and Expense Declaration filed by Mejia Orellana, Natalia Elena. Action Type: Declaration Regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure and Income and Expense Declaration; Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • Request for Default against Samuel Mejia Entered Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • Summons issued and filed. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • Order on Application for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs - Granted as to Natalia Elena Mejia Orellana. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • Request to Waive Court Fees filed by Mejia Orellana, Natalia Elena. Action Type: Request to Waive Court Fees; Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • Declaration Under Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction and Enforcement Act filed by Mejia Orellana, Natalia Elena. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • Petition for Dissolution of Marriage filed by Mejia Orellana, Natalia Elena. Action Type: Petition for Dissolution of Marriage; Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • Case initiated. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less