This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 07:28:10 (UTC).

Najia Naderi vs Keystone Restaurant Group, LLC, a California company

Case Summary

On 02/18/2016 Najia Naderi filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against Keystone Restaurant Group, LLC, a California company. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Holly, Carter and Humphreys, Elizabeth. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************1704

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judges

Holly, Carter

Humphreys, Elizabeth

 

Party Details

Defendant

Keystone Restaurant Group, LLC, a California company

Guardian Ad Litem

Naderi, Najia

Minor

A, Zarin

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Giamela, Lonnie D.

Guardian Ad Litem and Minor Attorneys

Le Clercq, Jean-Paul

LeClercq, Jean-Paul

 

Court Documents

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal - Entire Action as to Keystone Restaurant Group, LLC, a California company, Najia Naderi, Zarin A Entered. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Keystone Restaurant Group, LLC, a California company. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

Notice of Reassignment of Judicial Officer (EH)

Elizabeth Humphreys Assigned. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

Notice of Hearing

Hearing regarding: CMC: Further Case Management Conference , set for 11/17/2016 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Carter Holly in Department 41. Judge: Holly, Carter.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on 08/16/2016 08:45 AM . Judge: Holly, Carter.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by A, Zarin; Naderi, Najia. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Holly, Carter.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Keystone Restaurant Group, LLC, a California company. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Holly, Carter.

Answer

First Paper Answer to complaint Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000) filed by Keystone Restaurant Group, LLC, a California company. Action Type: First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000); Judge: Holly, Carter.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Keystone Restaurant Group, LLC, a California company served on 03/22/2016. Type of Service Personal. . Judge: Holly, Carter.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Holly, Carter.

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by A, Zarin. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Holly, Carter.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by A, Zarin. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Holly, Carter.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2016
  • Case status updated to Disposed. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2016
  • Hearing Result: CMC Vacated Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal - Entire Action as to Keystone Restaurant Group, LLC, a California company, Najia Naderi, Zarin A Entered. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2016
  • Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by A, Zarin; Naderi, Najia. Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Statement filed by Keystone Restaurant Group, LLC, a California company. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2016
  • Hearing regarding: CMC: Further Case Management Conference , set for 11/17/2016 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Elizabeth Humphreys in Department 22. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2016
  • Hearing Result: Vacated Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Elizabeth Humphreys Assigned. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Hearing regarding: CMC: Further Case Management Conference , set for 11/17/2016 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Carter Holly in Department 41. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on 08/16/2016 08:45 AM . Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 05/06/2016
  • Payment received by Legal Support Network, LLC in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 58071. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to Keystone Restaurant Group, LLC, a California company served on 03/22/2016. Type of Service Personal. . Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • Application and Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem of Minor filed by Zarin A, Keystone Restaurant Group, LLC, a California company. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2016
  • Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 08/16/2016 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Carter Holly in Department 41. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2016
  • Payment received by One Legal LLC in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 32657. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by A, Zarin. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by A, Zarin. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2016
  • Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less