This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 07:41:14 (UTC).

Mohammad Khair Abdulhadi vs Awais Shabbir

Case Summary

On 02/23/2016 Mohammad Khair Abdulhadi filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Awais Shabbir. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts , Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ross, Roger. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************1845

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Ross, Roger

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Abdulhadi, Mohammad Khair

Defendant

Shabbir, Awais

 

Court Documents

Notice to Filing Party

01/13/2017: Notice to Filing Party

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Default against Awais Shabbir Not Entered- Previously entered Judge: Ross, Roger.

Notice of Hearing

Hearing regarding: CMC: Judgment , set for 11/18/2017 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Roger Ross in Department 11B. Judge: Ross, Roger.

Notice of Hearing

Hearing regarding: Further Case Management Conference , set for 11/29/2017 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Roger Ross in Department 13. Judge: Ross, Roger.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Default against Awais Shabbir Denied. Judge: Ross, Roger.

Declaration

Declaration filed by Abdulhadi, Mohammad Khair. Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Ross, Roger.

MC040 Notice of Change of Address

Notice of Change of Address filed by Abdulhadi, Mohammad Khair. Action Type: Notice of Change of Address; Judge: Ross, Roger.

Clerk's Certificate of Mailing Notice of Trial De Novo

Hearing regarding: Court's OSC Re: Failure to Appear and CMC re status of default judgment, set for 01/30/2018 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Roger Ross in Department 11B. Judge: Ross, Roger.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Default against Awais Shabbir Not Entered Judge: Ross, Roger.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for CMC: Judgment held on 12/13/2017 08:30 AM . Judge: Ross, Roger.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Awais Shabbir served on 03/10/2016. Type of Service Substituted service. No substitute and No mailing Cert. . Judge: Ross, Roger.

Proof of Service

Proof of service as to copy of Entry of Default, copy of JUD 100 filed by Abdulhadi, Mohammad Khair. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Ross, Roger.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of service filed by Abdulhadi, Mohammad Khair. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Ross, Roger.

Notice to Filing Party

05/02/2017: Notice to Filing Party

Notice of Hearing

Hearing regarding: CMC: Judgment , set for 12/13/2017 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Roger Ross in Department 11B. (The original hearing was scheduled for Sat., 11/18/17). Judge: Ross, Roger.

Declaration

Declaration filed by Abdulhadi, Mohammad Khair. Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Ross, Roger.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Court's OSC Re: Dismissal held on 01/05/2017 08:30 AM . Judge: Ross, Roger.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Further Case Management Conference held on 11/29/2016 08:30 AM . Judge: Ross, Roger.

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2018
  • Case status updated to Disposed. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • Hearing Result: Vacated Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment for Mohammad Khair Abdulhadi against Awais Shabbir in the amount of 61015.00. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Change of Address filed by Abdulhadi, Mohammad Khair. Action Type: Notice of Change of Address; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Court's OSC Re: Failure to Appear held on 01/30/2018 08:30 AM . Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • Hearing regarding: CMC: Judgment , set for 03/02/2018 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Roger Ross in Department 11B. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • Hearing re: Court's OSC Re: Failure to Appear held on January 30, 2018. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Default against Awais Shabbir Entered Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • Request for Entry of Default and Clerk Judgment filed by Abdulhadi, Mohammad Khair. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Default against Awais Shabbir Not Entered- Previously entered Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
52 More Docket Entries
  • 08/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 08/22/2016 08:30 AM . Judge: Sueyres, F. Clark.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to Awais Shabbir served on 03/10/2016. Type of Service Substituted service. No substitute and No mailing Cert. . Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 08/22/2016 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Roger Ross in Department 13. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Order on Application for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs - Granted as to Mohammad Khair Abdulhadi filed. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Request to Waive Court Fees filed by Abdulhadi, Mohammad Khair. Action Type: Request to Waive Court Fees; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Abdulhadi, Mohammad Khair. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Abdulhadi, Mohammad Khair. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less