Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 19:47:39 (UTC).

Mohammad Azam vs Jennifer Lewis et al.

Case Summary

On 09/21/2016 Mohammad Azam filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Jennifer Lewis. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Sparks, Sheryle. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************9482

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Sparks, Sheryle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Azam, Mohammad

Defendants

Lewis, Jennifer

Lewis, Carolyn

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Sadiq, Shafeeq

 

Court Documents

EJ130 Writ of Execution

Writ of Possession as to Jennifer Lewis served on 10/25/2016 by Returned With Full Satisfaction. $145.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

UD110 Judgment- Unlawful Detainer

Clerk's Default Judgment for Possession for Mohammad Azam against Jennifer Lewis, Carolyn Lewis filed and entered Judgment applies to all occupants. See judgment filed herein. . Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Clerk Judgment filed by Azam, Mohammad. ALL OCCUPANTS previously entered. Action Type: Request for Entry of Clerk Judgment; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed by Azam, Mohammad. ALL OCCUPANTS ENTERED Action Type: Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Notice to Filing Party

Request for Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed by Azam, Mohammad. ALL OCCUPANTS ENTERED Action Type: Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Declaration

Declaration filed by Azam, Mohammad. Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of service of Summons as TO ALL OCCUPANTS filed by Azam, Mohammad. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Jennifer Lewis served on 09/21/2016 by Personal Service. $40.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Carolyn Lewis served on 09/21/2016 by Personal Service. $40.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Default against Jennifer Lewis, Carolyn Lewis Entered Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Azam, Mohammad. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

SUM130 Summons - Unlawful Detainer

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Unlawful Detainer; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Complaint

Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000) filed by Azam, Mohammad. Action Type: Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

NoticethatYouHaveBeenSued.rtf

Notice That You Have Been Sued. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Possession as to Jennifer Lewis served on 10/25/2016 by Returned With Full Satisfaction. $145.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2016
  • Writ of Possession as to Carolyn Lewis served on 10/25/2016 by Returned With Full Satisfaction. $145.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2016
  • Writ of Possession issued as to Jennifer Lewis on 10/07/2016 to San Joaquin County. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2016
  • Writ of Possession issued as to Carolyn Lewis on 10/07/2016 to San Joaquin County. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2016
  • Writ of Possession issued as to Jennifer Lewis on 10/07/2016 to San Joaquin County. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2016
  • Case status updated to Disposed. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Default Judgment for Possession for Mohammad Azam against Jennifer Lewis, Carolyn Lewis filed and entered Judgment applies to all occupants. See judgment filed herein. . Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2016
  • Payment received by Mohammad Azam in the amount of $25.00. Receipt number 108324. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Entry of Clerk Judgment filed by Azam, Mohammad. ALL OCCUPANTS previously entered. Action Type: Request for Entry of Clerk Judgment; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration filed by Azam, Mohammad. Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 09/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to Carolyn Lewis served on 09/21/2016 by Personal Service. $40.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of service of Summons as TO ALL OCCUPANTS filed by Azam, Mohammad. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2016
  • Request for Entry of Default - Civil filed by Azam, Mohammad. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default - Civil; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2016
  • Attorney, Shafeeq Sadiq, retained for Mohammad Azam . Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice That You Have Been Sued. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000) filed by Azam, Mohammad. Action Type: Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2016
  • Payment received by Mohammad Azam in the amount of $240.00. Receipt number 103198. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Unlawful Detainer; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Azam, Mohammad. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sadiq, Shafeeq