This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/17/2018 at 18:36:14 (UTC).

Mishelle Neverson vs Brookdale Senior Living Communities, inc., a Delaware corporation et al.

Case Summary

On 05/01/2017 Mishelle Neverson filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Brookdale Senior Living Communities, inc , a Delaware corporation. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Holly, Carter. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************4356

  • Filing Date:

    05/01/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Holly, Carter

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Neverson, Mishelle

Defendants

Brookdale Senior Living Communities, inc., a Delaware corporation

Emeritus Corporation, a Washington corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bagosy, Jennifer R

Defendant Attorney

Boyce, Shannon R.

 

Court Documents

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Motion to Compel held on 05/03/2018 09:00 AM . Judge: Holly, Carter.

Separate Statement

Plaintiff Mishelle Neverson's Separate Statement in Support of Motion to Compel Defendant Emeritus Corporation to Provide Further Responses to, and Performance of Defendant's Obligations Under, Requests for Production Set One, Pursuant to California Code of Civil Procedure 2031.310 and 2031.320 filed by Neverson, Mishelle. Action Type: Separate Statement; Judge: Holly, Carter.

Declaration in Support

Declaration of Jennifer Bagosy in Support of Plaintiff Mishelle Neverson's Motion to Compel Defendant Emeritus to Provide Further Responses to, and Performance of Defendant's Obligations Under, Requests for Production Set One, Pursuant to California Code of Civil Procedure 2031.310 and 2031.320; Motion for Sanctions filed by Neverson, Mishelle. Action Type: Declaration in Support; Judge: Holly, Carter.

Motion to Compel

Plaintiff Mishelle Neverson's Motion to Compel Defendant Brookdale Senior Living Communities, Inc. to Provide Further Responses to, and Performance of Defendant's Obligations Under, Requests for Production Set One, Pursuant to California Code of Civil Procedure 2031.310 and 2031.320; Motion for Sanctions filed by Neverson, Mishelle. Action Type: Motion or other paper requesting a hearing; Judge: Holly, Carter.

Proof of Service

Proof of service filed by Neverson, Mishelle. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Holly, Carter.

Order

Stipulated Protective Order filed by Brookdale Senior Living Communities, inc., a Delaware corporation, Emeritus Corporation, a Washington corporation. - signed by Judge Holly Judge: Holly, Carter.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 10/30/2017 08:45 AM . Judge: Holly, Carter.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Neverson, Mishelle. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Holly, Carter.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Brookdale Senior Living Communities, inc., a Delaware corporation. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Holly, Carter.

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing on Plaintiff's Motions to Compel filed by Neverson, Mishelle. Action Type: Notice of Hearing; Judge: Holly, Carter.

Proof of Service

Proof of service of Plaintiff's Motions to Compel and Supporting Documents filed by Neverson, Mishelle. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Holly, Carter.

Motion to Compel

Plaintiff Mishelle Neverson's Motion to Compel Defendant Emeritus to Provide Further Responses to, and Performance of Defendant's Obligations Under, Requests for Production Set One, Pursuant to California Code of Civil Procedure 2031.310 and 2031.320;Motion for Sanctions filed by Neverson, Mishelle. Action Type: Motion or other paper requesting a hearing; Judge: Holly, Carter.

Motion to Compel

Plaintiff Mishelle Neverson's Motion to Compel Defendant Brookdale Senior Living Communities, Inc. to Provide Further Responses to Special Interrogatories, Set One, Pursuant to California Code of Civil Procedure 2030.210 and 2030.300; Motion for Sanctions filed by Neverson, Mishelle. Action Type: Motion or other paper requesting a hearing; Judge: Holly, Carter.

Declaration in Support

Declaration of Jennifer Bagosy in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Defendant Brookdale senior Living Communities, Inc. to Provide Further Responses to, and Performance of Defendant's Obligations Under, Requests for Production Set One, Pursuant to California Code of Civil Procedure 2031.310 and 2031.320; Motion for Sanctions filed by Neverson, Mishelle. Action Type: Declaration in Support; Judge: Holly, Carter.

Order

Order Appointing Official Reporter Pro Tempore filed. Judge: Holly, Carter.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Emeritus Corporation, a Washington corporation served on 05/10/2017 by Personal Service. $125.50. Judge: Holly, Carter.

Paga Enforcement Action

Paga Enforcement Action filed by Neverson, Mishelle. Jury Trial Demanded. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Holly, Carter.

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Holly, Carter.

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/29/2018
  • Hearing regarding: CMC: Further Case Management Conference , set for 09/26/2018 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Carter Holly in Department 10B. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Motion to Compel held on 05/29/2018 08:45 AM . Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • Hearing re: CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on May 29, 2018. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • Payment received in the amount of $3.50, receipt number 292078. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Stipulation & Order to Continue Hearing on Plaintiff's Motions to Compel entered and filed. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • Hearing regarding: Motion to Compel ltf's Motion to Compel Deft Emeritus to Provide Further Responses to, and Performance of Defendant's Obligations Under, Requests for Production Set One., set for 08/09/2018 at 9:00 AM before Hon. Carter Holly in Department 10B. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • Hearing regarding: Motion to Compel Pltf's Motion to Compel Defendant Emeritus to Provide Further Responses, set for 08/09/2018 at 9:00 AM before Hon. Carter Holly in Department 10B. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • Hearing regarding: Motion to Compel Pltf's Motion to Compel Deft Brookdale Senior Living Communities, Inc. to Provide Further Responses to Special Interrogatories, Set One, set for 08/09/2018 at 9:00 AM before Hon. Carter Holly in Department 10B. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • Hearing regarding: Motion to Compel Pltf's Motion to Compel Deft Brookdale Senior Living Communities to Provide Further Responses, set for 08/09/2018 at 9:00 AM before Hon. Carter Holly in Department 10B. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Motion to Compel held on 05/03/2018 09:00 AM . Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
51 More Docket Entries
  • 06/09/2017
  • Payment received by inc., Brookdale Senior Living Communities in the amount of $870.00. Receipt number 177601. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to Emeritus Corporation, a Washington corporation served on 05/10/2017 by Personal Service. $125.50. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to Brookdale Senior Living Communities, inc., a Delaware corporation served on 05/10/2017 by Personal Service. $240.50. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 10/30/2017 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Carter Holly in Department 10B. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • Case initiated. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Neverson, Mishelle. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Paga Enforcement Action filed by Neverson, Mishelle. Jury Trial Demanded. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • Payment received by Mishelle Neverson in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 164623. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BROOKDALE SENIOR LIVING COMMUNITIES INC is a litigant

Latest cases where EMERITUS CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BOYCE SHANNON R.