This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 09/10/2022 at 08:02:42 (UTC).

Miriam Alicia Torres Silva vs Tower Zone Smoke Shop et al.

Case Summary

On 06/01/2022 Miriam Alicia Torres Silva filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Tower Zone Smoke Shop. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lee, Jayne. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************4429

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Lee, Jayne

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Torres Silva, Miriam Alicia

Defendants

Muthana, Naser

Muthanna, Ahmed Muthanna

Tower Zone Smoke Shop

U-Haul International, Inc.

Uhaul Co. of California

Muthanna, Taher Mohammed Ali

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Beecher, Brian Gordon

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Torres Silva, Miriam Alicia.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Torres Silva, Miriam Alicia.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Ahmed Muthanna Muthanna served on 06/10/2022 by Personal Service. $155.23.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Uhaul Co. of California served on 06/13/2022 by Personal Service. $105.23.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to U-Haul International, Inc. served on 06/15/2022 by Personal Service. $225.23.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Naser Muthana served on 06/17/2022 by Substituted Service. $180.22.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Tower Zone Smoke Shop served on 06/17/2022 by Substituted Service. $220.21.

Amendment to Complaint

Amendment filed by Torres Silva, Miriam Alicia.

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal - Participant entered as to Fady Jarrouche.

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice filed by Torres Silva, Miriam Alicia.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/28/2022
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10C; Judge: Jayne Lee; Participants; Ahmed Muthanna Muthanna (Defendant); Fady Jarrouche (Defendant); Miriam Alicia Torres Silva (Plaintiff); Naser Muthana (Defendant); Tower Zone Smoke Shop (Defendant); U-Haul International, Inc. (Defendant); Uhaul Co. of California (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal - Participant entered as to Fady Jarrouche.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal without Prejudice filed by Torres Silva, Miriam Alicia.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmendment filed by Torres Silva, Miriam Alicia.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Tower Zone Smoke Shop served on 06/17/2022 by Substituted Service. $220.21.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Naser Muthana served on 06/17/2022 by Substituted Service. $180.22.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to U-Haul International, Inc. served on 06/15/2022 by Personal Service. $225.23.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Uhaul Co. of California served on 06/13/2022 by Personal Service. $105.23.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Ahmed Muthanna Muthanna served on 06/10/2022 by Personal Service. $155.23.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 11/28/2022 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Jayne Lee in Department 10C.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Torres Silva, Miriam Alicia.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Torres Silva, Miriam Alicia.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketPayment received by Miriam Torres Silva in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 743397.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketAttorney, Brian Gordon Beecher, retained for Miriam Alicia Torres Silva .; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketCase initiated.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UHAUL is a litigant

Latest cases where U-HAUL INTERNATIONAL INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRIAN G. BEECHER