This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 03/27/2022 at 02:42:43 (UTC).

Minnie Diallo vs Stephen Salvatore

Case Summary

On 10/20/2021 Minnie Diallo filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against Stephen Salvatore. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Manteca Branch Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Agbayani, Tony J.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************9809

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Agbayani, Tony J.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Diallo, Minnie

Respondent

Salvatore, Stephen

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Sawyer, Neat Allen

Respondent Attorney

Ellis, Albert M

 

Court Documents

CivilRestrainingOrderNoticetoFilingParty.rtf

Civil Restraining Order Notice to Filing Party.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Diallo, Minnie.

CH100 Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders

Request for Orders to Stop Harassment with Violence (Civil Harassment) filed by Diallo, Minnie.

Denied CH110 Temporary Restraining Order

Temporary Restraining Order Denied and filed on 10/20/2021.

CH109 Notice of Court Hearing (Civil Harassment Prevention)

Notice of Court Hearing - TRO filed by Minnie Diallo.

FW003 Order on Court Fee Waiver

Order on Application for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs - Granted as to Minnie Diallo.

CH120 Response to Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders

Response to Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders filed by Salvatore, Stephen along with pos.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service of Proof of Service as to Stephen Salvatore served on 11/01/2021 by Personal Service. $40.00.

Minute_Order.rtf

Minutes finalized for OSC Re: Harassment held on 11/09/2021 10:30 AM .

Minute_Order.rtf

Minutes finalized for OSC Re: Harassment held on 11/10/2021 10:30 AM .

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2021
  • HearingHearing Type: OSC Re: Harassment; Court Room: M2; Result: Held; Judge: Tony J. Agbayani

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for OSC Re: Harassment held on 11/10/2021 10:30 AM .; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketDismissal - Other Entered as of 11/10/2021; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketHearing re: OSC Re: Harassment held on November 10, 2021.; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • HearingHearing Type: OSC Re: Harassment; Court Room: M2; Result: Continued-Court's Motion; Judge: Tony J. Agbayani

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketAttorney, Neat Allen Sawyer, retained for Minnie Diallo .; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketHearing regarding: OSC Re: Harassment , set for 11/10/2021 at 10:30 AM before Hon. Tony J. Agbayani in Department M2.; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for OSC Re: Harassment held on 11/09/2021 10:30 AM .; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketOSC Re: Harassment No POS scheduled on 11/09/2021 at 10:30 AM has been Continued.; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Proof of Service as to Stephen Salvatore served on 11/01/2021 by Personal Service. $40.00.; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders filed by Salvatore, Stephen along with pos.; Action Type: Response to Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder on Application for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs - Granted as to Minnie Diallo.; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees filed by Diallo, Minnie.; Action Type: Request to Waive Court Fees; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketHearing regarding: OSC Re: Harassment , set for 11/09/2021 at 10:30 AM before Hon. Tony J. Agbayani in Department M2.; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Court Hearing - TRO filed by Minnie Diallo.; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order Denied and filed on 10/20/2021.; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Restraining Order Notice to Filing Party.; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketCase initiated.; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Orders to Stop Harassment with Violence (Civil Harassment) filed by Diallo, Minnie.; Action Type: Request for Orders to Stop Harassment with Violence (Civil Harassment); Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Diallo, Minnie.; Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ellis, Albert M